Julia Cerritos v. Jefferson B. Sessions, III
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-ins-01576 |
Type | immigration / review |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 09, 2017 1:20 PM CDT |
Petitioner
Julia Mejia Cerritos
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General of the United States
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/09/2017 1:20 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
Agency case docketed [4513202] 17-1576 (JMH) | ||
PETITION for Review of an order of the Board of Immigration Appeals (Rec'd by MAIL) filed by Petitioner Ms. Julia Mejia Cerritos w/service 03/16/2017 [4513211] 17-1576 (JMH) | ||
Att: 1 4 pgs Petition For Review Letter | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs petition | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs cover letter | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Mail label |