BNSF Railway Company v. Steven McArthur, et al
Original Case: 2:15-cv-00992
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-35216 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 13, 2017 1:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
JAY TURNQUIST
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TONIA RUPRECHT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LINDSAY DUNN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THEODORE MAYER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DAVID BECKNER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
STEVEN MCARTHUR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, a Delaware corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/13/2017 1:27 AM PDT |
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/22/2017. First cross appeal brief due 06/21/2017 for BNSF Railway Company. Second brief on cross appeal due 07/21/2017 for David Beckner, Lindsay Dunn, Theodore Mayer, Steven McArthur, Tonia Ruprecht and Jay Turnquist. Third brief on cross appeal due 08/21/2017 for BNSF Railway Company; optional reply brief due 14 days from date of service of third brief. [10358184] 17-35216 17-35208 (KM) [Entered: 03/15/2017 03:42 PM] | |
2 | 2 Attorney Michael Schwartz in 17-35208 and 17-35216 substituted by Attorney Michael H. Schwartz in 17-35208 and 17-35216 [10358473] 17-35208 17-35216 (RY) [Entered: 03/15/2017 05:40 PM] |