Paramount Media Group, Inc. v. Village of Bellwood, et al
Original Case: 1:13-cv-03994
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01562 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 18, 2019 3:45 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
VILLAGE OF BELLWOOD, an Illinois municipal corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
IMAGE MEDIA ADVERTISING, INC., an Illinois municipal corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
PARAMOUNT MEDIA GROUP, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/18/2019 3:34 AM CDT |
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 03/30/2017. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/25/2017 for Paramount Media Group, Inc. [1] [6826251] 17-1562 (CR) [Entered: 03/16/2017 12:52 PM] |