B&B Hardware, Inc. v. Hargis Industries, Inc.
Original Case: 4:06-cv-01654
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01570 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 24, 2018 2:25 AM CST |
Defendant
East Texas Fasteners, a business entity of form unknown
|
|
Defendant
Does, 1 through 10, inclusive
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Hargis Industries Inc, a Texas Corporation, doing business as East Texas Fasteners, doing business as Sealtite Building Fasteners
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Hargis Industries, Inc., a Texas Corporation, doing business as East Texas Fasteners, doing business as Sealtite Building Fasteners
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
B&B Hardware Inc, a California Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
B&B Hardware, Inc., a California Corporation
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 21 2018
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: James B. Loken, Duane Benton and Bobby E. Shepherd AUTHORING JUDGE:Bobby E. Shepherd (PUBLISHED) [4738819] [17-1570, 17-1755] |
Docket last updated: 12/24/2018 2:25 AM CST |
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4513049] 17-1570 (AEV) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Verdict Form 6/10/16, Judgment 6/24/16, Order 2/16/17, docket entries, [4513060] 17-1570 (AEV) | ||
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/25/2017. Appendix due 05/05/2017. BRIEF APPELLANT, B&B Hardware Inc due 05/05/2017 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4513062] 17-1570 (AEV) |