Montco Offshore, Inc. and Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-31646 |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Montco Offshore, Inc, Debtor
842 W Sam Houston Pkwy N Ste 500
Houston, TX 77024-4588 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC
17751 Highway 3235 Ste 500
Galliano, LA 70354-3578 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Montco Offshore, Inc.
842 W Sam Houston Pkwy N Ste 500
Houston, TX 77024-4588 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Monday Jun 12, 2017 5:00 PM CDT |
Attorney
Diverse Safety and Scaffolding LLC
17171 Park Row
Houston, TX 77084 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Oceaneering International Inc.
Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP 1000 Louisiana Street Suite 2000
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Regions Bank
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fieldwood Energy LLC
2000 W Sam Houston Pkwy S Suite 1200
Houston, TX 77042 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fugro USA Marine, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TETRA Applied Technologies, LLC
1000 Main St. 36th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Tara L. Grundemeier Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
International Snubbing Services, L.L.C.
190 Industries Lane
Arnaudville, LA 70512 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Swivel Rental
105 Commission Blvd.
Lafayette, LA 70508 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
LeBlanc & Associates, L.L.C.
132 Intracoastal Drive
Houma, LA 70363 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stansbury and Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Maritech Resources, LLC
Porter Hedges LLP 1000 Main Street, 36th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tetra Technologies, Inc.
1000 Main St. 36th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Proserv Operations, Inc.
15151 Sommermeyer Street
Houston, TX 77041 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oceaneering International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Odyssea Marine, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC
Jackson Walker LLP 1401 McKinney, Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Offshore Technical Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oil States International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oil States Skagat Smatco, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Petro Pull, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Piranha Rentals, LLC
PO Box 759
Thibodaux, LA 70301 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Work Boat Electrical Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Weatherford International, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
10 M Marine LLC
Holly C Hamm Snow Spence Green LLP 2929 Allen Parkway Suite 2800
Houston, TX 77019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Alliance Energy Services, LLC
1100 Poydras Street Suite 3100
New Orleans, LA 70163 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Alliance Offshore, LLC
1100 Poydras Street Suite 3100
New Orleans, LA 70163 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Alta Mesa Holdings, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aqueos Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
W&T Offshore, Inc.
600 Travis Street 26th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thomas Energy Services, LLC d/b/a Thomas Tools, LLC
Snow Spence Green LLP 2929 Allen Parkway Ste 2800
Houston, TX 77019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bollinger Fourchon, LLC
1402 Mark Dr. P.O. Box 241
Lockport, LA 70374 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Extreme Energy Services, LLC
P. O. Box 1468
Broussard, LA 70518 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
C&G Welding, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cairn Energy USA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CityCentre Three Partners, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dale Martin Offshore, L.L.C.
200 Beaullieu Drive
Lafayette, LA 70508 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
DeepCor Marine, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
c/o Craig A. Ryan Eaton Oil Tools, Inc.
Onebane Law Firm 1200 Camellia Blvd., Suite 300
Lafayette, LA 70508 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Workforce Commission
John Stern P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
John Stern P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
The Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Montco Offshore, Inc., et al.
1000 Main St. 36th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Blackhill Partners, LLC
Sidley Austin LLP c/o Blackhill Partners LLC Attn: Thomas A. Labuda Jr. 1 S Dearborn St.
Chicago, IL 60603 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Pipeline II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Richard Schmidt
1113 Vine St Suite 201
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
M21K, LLC
1021 Main Street, Suite 2626
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
JX Nippon Oil Exploration (U.S.A.) Limited
5151 SAN FELIPE, SUITE 750
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Furth Oil Co.
Nathan Sommers Jacobs, P.C. 2800 Post Oak Blvd., 61st Floor
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Energy XXI Pipeline II, LLC
1021 Main Street, Suite 2626
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Energy XXI GOM, LLC
1021 Main Street, Suite 2626
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Elite Communication Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
EPL Oil & Gas, Inc.
1021 Main Street, Suite 2626
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Argonaut Insurance Company
Looper Goodwine P.C. 650 Poydras Street, Suite 2400
New Orleans, LA 70130 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Westchester Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
436 Walnut Street WA10A
Philadelphia, PA 19106 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 15 2020
Memorandum Opinion Signed on 7/15/2020 (Related document(s):1057 Motion For Summary Judgment) (TylerLaws) |
1. | Montco Offshore files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy due to downturn in oil and gas industry (bankruptcompanynews.com) |
Submitted Fri 03/24/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 04/17 12:46 PM
Stipulated Dismissal Under Rule 41. Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3347 Closed. (tjl4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 04/17 12:47 PM
Stipulated Dismissal Under Rule 41. Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3336 Closed. (tjl4) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 04/15 7:54 AM
Stipulated Dismissal Under Rule 41. Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3355 Closed. (tjl4) |