Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC Jointly Administered under 17-31646
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-31646
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-31646
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-31647 |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC
17751 Highway 3235 Ste 500
Galliano, LA 70354-3578 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago |
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Mon 02/26 4:00 PM
Withdrawal of Claim: 20 Proof of Claim (Lewinski, Kim) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice
Mon 02/26 3:28 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Proof of Claim . Filed by Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC (Lewinski, Kim) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/27 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 07/26/2017. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/27 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 07/26/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/24 8:06 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Signed on 7/24/2017. (dhan) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/24 8:03 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Signed on 7/24/2017. (dhan) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 07/21 3:10 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice . Filed by Creditor Premier Offshore Catering Inc (amir) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 07/21 3:09 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice . Filed by Creditor Becnel Rental Tools LLC (amir) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Mon 07/17 10:57 AM
Withdrawal of Claim: 18 (Crawford, Janaha) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Fri 05/26 9:29 AM
Withdrawal of Claim: 3 (Crawford, Janaha) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate
Mon 03/20 4:58 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC ) (Slusher, Vincent) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 03/20 3:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brandon Taylor Darden Filed by on behalf of Alliance Offshore, LLC, Alliance Energy Services, LLC (Darden, Brandon) |
|
Sunday, March 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 03/19 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 251. Notice Date 03/19/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order for Joint Administration
Fri 03/17 11:11 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Signed on 3/17/2017. (tcam) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 03/17 10:52 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice David Avraham . Filed by Debtor Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC (Slusher, Vincent) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration
Fri 03/17 1:25 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC (Slusher, Vincent) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
20
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Fri 03/17 1:18 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Montco Oilfield Contractors, LLC. (Slusher, Vincent) |
|
crditcrd
none
Fri 03/17 1:20 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-31647 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18828119. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 03/17 9:56 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Christine A March (March, Christine) |