Lytle Trucking, LLC
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-40371 |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 27, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 26, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Feb 08, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $50,001 to $100,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Lytle Trucking, LLC
311 S 9th St
Mc Cook, NE 69001-4122 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Patricia Fahey
U.S. Trustee's Office 111 So 18th Plz Suite 1148
Omaha, NE 68102 |
Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago |
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
83 | 83
court
Notice of Filing in a Closed Case
Thu 01/10 8:03 AM
Notice of Filing in a Closed Case. The document related to this notice has been filed in a closed case. YOU ARE NOTIFIED by the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court that no action will be taken regarding this matter, unless a Motion to Reopen Case and the appropriate filing fee are received by this court. This document is considered administratively stricken from the record. (TEXT ONLY) . (kks) |
|
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
82 | 82
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 01/09 11:14 AM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 17-40371 TLS] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 181.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7768868, amount $ 181.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
81 | 81
motion
Relief from Stay
Wed 01/09 11:13 AM
Motion for Relief from Stay . Fee Amount $ 181 Filed by Creditor First Central Bank McCook (Pederson, Matthew) |