Crogan's Bar & Grill, Inc.
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Charles Novack |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-40741 |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 22, 2020 |
Debtor
Crogan's Bar & Grill, Inc.
327 Rock Oak Rd
Walnut Creek, CA 94598-2732 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Marlene G. Weinstein
1511 Sycamore Ave. #M-259
Hercules, CA 94547 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Docket last updated: 03/17/2017 12:02 PM PDT |
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 03/17 11:56 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-40741 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt number 27315990, amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Fri 03/17 11:57 AM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/25/2017 at 09:30 AM at Oakland U.S. Trustee Office. (Primus, Michael) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 03/17 11:55 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $335. Filed by Crogan's Bar & Grill, Inc.. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 03/31/2017. (Primus, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Fri 03/17 11:56 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ 6000 Filed by Debtor Crogan's Bar & Grill, Inc. (Primus, Michael) |