|
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 12/28 12:47 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (dhc)
Related: [-]
|
43
|
|
43
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal
Sat 10/21 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Notice Date 10/20/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
42
|
|
42
order
Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal
Wed 10/18 3:34 PM
Order Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal. All orders entered by this Court within, and in relation to, this case shall remain valid and in full force and effect. Related [+]. Signed on 10/18/2017 (cam)
|
41
|
|
41
order
Compensation
Fri 10/06 1:28 PM
Order for Compensation Granting for SilvermanAcampora LLP, fees awarded: $31,550.00, expenses awarded: $130.94; Related [+]. Signed on 10/6/2017 (cam)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Thu 10/05 12:58 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance by Brian Powers, Al Dimin Related [+]Case to be Dismissed(cmoffett)
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Thu 10/05 1:00 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearance: Brian Powers, Al Dimino. Motion Granted; Submit Order (cmoffett)
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Thu 10/05 1:00 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearance: Brian Powers, Al Dimino. Motion Granted; Submit Order (cmoffett)
|
40
|
|
40
misc
Operating Report
Tue 10/03 10:49 AM
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 1, 2017 to September 30, 2017 Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
39
|
|
39
order
Authorize/Direct
Fri 08/25 4:02 PM
Final Order Granting Motion To Authorizing the Debtor to incur Post Petition Financing Related [+] Signed on 8/25/2017. (cam)
|
38
|
|
38
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 08/24 3:18 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case /Debtor's Motion for an Order Providing for the Dismissal of the Debtor's Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case . Objections to be filed on September 28, 2017. Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 10/5/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A-proposed Order
|
| |
Att: 2
Appendix Affidavit of Service
|
37
|
|
37
motion
Compensation (Application)
Thu 08/24 3:03 PM
Final Application for Compensation. for SilvermanAcampora LLP, Attorneys for Debtor and Debtor in Posssession as Attorney; Fees: $ 31,550.00 Expenses: $ 130.94 Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 10/5/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A-Category List
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B-Professionals List
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C-Disbursement Summary
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit D-time records and invoices
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit E-Certification
|
| |
Att: 6
Appendix Affidavit of Service
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK)
Tue 08/22 11:55 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance by Brian Powers, Gerard Luckman, Al Dimino. Status hearing to be held on 10/05/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (cmoffett)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Tue 08/22 11:58 AM
Hearing Held; Appearance by Brian Powers, Gerard Luckman, Al Dimin Related [+] Motion Granted; Submit Final Order(cmoffett)
|
36
|
|
36
order
Generic Order
Fri 07/21 3:21 PM
Interim Order authorizing the debtor to incur post petition financing from the Lender pursuant to the terms and conditions of the Financing Document, Order to Schedule Final Hearin Related [+]. Final Hearing scheduled for 8/22/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (cam)
|
35
|
|
35
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 07/21 1:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Gerard R Luckman on behalf of 41 Hempstead Tpke Realty Corp. (Luckman, Gerard)
Related: [-]
|
34
|
|
34
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 07/20 9:37 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Gerard R Luckman on behalf of 47 Hempstead Turnpike Corp., 41 Hempstead Tpke Realty Corp. (Luckman, Gerard)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Thu 07/20 12:50 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance by Brian Powers, Gerard Luckman, Stan Yan Related [+] Motion Granted; Submit Order (cmoffett)
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK)
Thu 07/20 12:51 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Status hearing to be held on 08/22/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (cmoffett)
Related: [-]
|
33
|
|
33
misc
Operating Report
Mon 07/17 4:21 PM
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 6/1/2017 - 6/30/2017 Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
32
|
|
32
misc
Operating Report
Thu 07/13 3:38 PM
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 1 - 31, 2017 Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
31
|
|
31
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Thu 07/13 11:38 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. Related [+] (Silverman, Kenneth)
|
30
|
|
30
order
Schedule Hearing (Generic)
Wed 07/12 2:50 PM
Order to Schedule Hearin Related [+]. Signed on 7/12/2017Hearing scheduled for 7/20/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (cam)
|
29
|
|
29
misc
Declaration
Wed 07/12 1:46 PM
Declaration Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. Related [+] (Silverman, Kenneth)
|
28
|
|
28
motion
Authorize/Direct
Wed 07/12 1:37 PM
Motion to Authorize/Direct /Motion for Order Scheduling Hearing on Shortened Notice to Consider Emergency Application for Order Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Post Petition Financing and Granting Related Relief Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. Related [+]. (Silverman, Kenneth)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A - Proposed Order
|
27
|
|
27
motion
Authorize/Direct
Wed 07/12 1:09 PM
Motion to Authorize/Direct /Emergency Application for Order Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Post Petition Financing and Granting Related Relief Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp.. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A - Financing Documents
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B - Proposed Order
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK)
Tue 07/11 1:55 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 07/27/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (cmoffett)
|
26
|
|
26
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Wed 06/14 2:16 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Approving Settlement Agreement between the Debtor and Empire Tax Fund V LLC, Empire V Corp., and Empire V New York Portfolio LL Related [+] Signed on 6/14/2017. (cam)
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK)
Tue 06/13 12:57 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance by Brian Powers, Stan Yang Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 07/20/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (cmoffett)
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Tue 06/13 12:58 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearance: Brian Powers, Stan Yang. Motion Granted; Submit Order (cmoffett)
|
25
|
|
25
order
Authorizing Retention of Attorney (Ch11)
Thu 06/01 11:14 AM
Order Authorizing Retention of Chapter 11 Attorney Silverman Acampora LLP Related [+]. Signed on 6/1/2017 (cam)
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK)
Tue 05/23 12:11 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing. Status hearing to be held on 06/13/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (cmoffett)
Related: [-]
|
24
|
|
24
misc
Operating Report
Mon 05/22 5:16 PM
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 17, 2017 through April 30, 2017 Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
23
|
|
23
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Thu 05/18 5:25 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. Related [+] (Silverman, Kenneth)
|
22
|
|
22
motion
Compromise Controversy
Thu 05/18 1:41 PM
Motion to Compromise Controversy /Debtor's Motion for an Order Approving Settlement Agreement between the Debtor and Empire Tax Fund V LLC, Empire V Corp., and Empire V New York Portfolio LLC . Objections to be filed on 6/6/2017. Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 6/13/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 1 - Stipulation
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit A - Schedule
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit B - Proposed Order
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit C - Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit D - Mutual Releases
|
21
|
|
21
misc
Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings)
Thu 05/18 1:25 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from May 23, 2017 to June 13, 2017 at 11:00 AM Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
motion
Employ (Application)
Tue 05/16 1:02 PM
Application to Employ SilvermanAcampora LLP as Attorneys for Debtor and Debtor-In-Possession Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp.. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Declaration of Kenneth P. Silverman in Support of Application to Employ SilvermanAcampora LLP as Attorneys for Debtor and Debtor-In-Possession
|
| |
Att: 2
"Lar-Dan" Declaration of Joseph Verdi in Connection with Application to Employ SilvermanAcampora LLP as Attorneys for Debtor
|
| |
Att: 3
Proposed Order
|
19
|
|
19
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 05/03 2:56 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Patrick Reynolds Gallagher on behalf of Nassau County Treasurer (Gallagher, Patrick)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK)
Fri 04/21 12:59 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance by Brian Powers, Stan Yang. Status hearing to be held on 05/23/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (cmoffett)
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
misc
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (No Fee)
Mon 04/17 1:20 PM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, : Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
misc
Letter
Mon 04/17 1:08 PM
Letter /Certificate of Resolution of Jayram Realty Corp. Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Mon 04/17 1:03 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
misc
Affidavit
Mon 04/17 12:55 PM
Affidavit Re: Declaration of Joanne Eisenberg Under Local Rule 1007-4 in Connection with Chapter 11 Filing, and Local Rule 9077-1 in Support of Certain "First Day" Motions Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A to Local Rule 1007-4 Declaration
|
14
|
|
14
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/04 1:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kenneth C Henry Jr on behalf of Samuel Hampton, LLC (Henry, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Settled/Withdrawn/Marked Off Without Hearing (Case Owned BK)
Tue 04/04 8:40 AM
Marked Off without hearing Related [+] Debtor's counsel filed a Notice of Appearance on 3/31/2017(cmoffett)
|
13
|
|
13
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Mon 04/03 5:08 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. Related [+] (Silverman, Kenneth)
|
12
|
|
12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order
Mon 04/03 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 04/02/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
order
Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges
Fri 03/31 4:02 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Signed on 3/31/2017 Status hearing to be held on 4/18/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (cam)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 03/31 2:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kenneth P Silverman on behalf of Jayram Realty Corp. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Defective or Deficient Filing Ch. 11
Thu 03/23 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Defective or Deficient Filing - Chapter 11 Non-Individual Notice Date 03/22/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
court
Notice of Hearing of Defective or Deficient Filing of Non-Individual Chapter 11 Case
Mon 03/20 4:12 PM
Notice of Hearing on Deficient Chapter 11 Case for debtor's failure to be represented by counsel. Hearing scheduled for 4/4/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. . Chapter 11 Non-Individual Attorney Cure due by 4/3/2017. Related [+] (ssw)
|
7
|
|
7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing
Mon 03/20 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 03/19/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 03/20 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/19/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing
Mon 03/20 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Notice Date 03/19/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Fri 03/17 3:54 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/21/2017 at 09:00 AM at Room 562, 560 Federal Plaza, CI, NY. (ssw)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Fri 03/17 3:50 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11: Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 3/17/2017. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 3/17/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 3/17/2017. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 3/17/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 3/31/2017. Schedule A/B due 3/31/2017. Schedule D due 3/31/2017. Schedule E/F due 3/31/2017. Schedule G due 3/31/2017. Schedule H due 3/31/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 3/31/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 3/31/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 3/31/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 3/31/2017. (ssw)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
9
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 03/17 3:38 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1717 Filed by Jayram Realty Corp. Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/17/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 7/17/2017. (ssw)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto
Fri 03/17 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1717.00. Receipt Number 249888. (SW) (admin)
Related: [-]
|