TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Tanya S Chutkan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00485 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 5:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY
|
Represented By
|
1. | Is the Ivy League's Admission Bias a "Trade Secret"? (wsj.com) |
Submitted Wed 03/29/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
.Order
Mon 12/11 2:14 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Converting Administrative Dismissal to a dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/11/17. (DJS) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 12/08 12:03 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. (Harrison, Lindsay) |
|
Friday, November 24, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Status Report
Fri 11/24 8:19 AM
STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS. (Snell, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Wed 10/25 12:50 PM
STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS. (Snell, Kevin) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Mon 09/25 2:37 PM
STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS. (Snell, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Thu 07/27 4:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 7/25/17 order remanding and staying this action and consolidated case 16-cv-2154-TSC, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to Administratively Close this case and the consolidated case. However, the parties shall continue to file their Status Reports as required by the 7/25/17 Minute Order. Upon resolution of the proceedings on remand, the parties may file a motion to return both cases to the court's active docket. Any such motion shall contain a proposed order for moving forward with the cases. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/27/17. (DJS) |
||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Tue 07/25 2:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed20 Motion is hereby GRANTED. This action and the consolidated case (16-cv-2154-TSC) are hereby STAYED. Both proceedings are hereby REMANDED to the agency for further proceedings. Defendants shall file a status report by 9/25/17, and every 30 days thereafter until the proceedings on remanded are finished. In light of the remand, the Court hereby STAYS this case along with the consolidated case (16-cv-2154-TSC) until Defendants notify the Court that they have made their determinations as to whether the documents that Plaintiff challenges are exempt from production. Defendant-Intervenors14 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record as hereby denied as moot. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/25/17. (DJS) |
||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Remand
Mon 07/17 5:29 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Remand and Stay by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS(Snell, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response to motion
Mon 07/17 5:26 PM
RESPONSE re14 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS.(Snell, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Mon 07/17 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kevin Matthew Snell on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Daniel Schaefer Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00485-TSC, 1:16-cv-02154-TSC(Snell, Kevin) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Proposed Order
Mon 07/17 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Proposed Order by TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY re16 Memorandum in Opposition (Harrison, Lindsay) |
|
16 | 16
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Mon 07/17 4:23 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re14 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record filed by TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. (Harrison, Lindsay) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 07/10 2:16 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/17/2017. (tb) Modified on 7/10/2017 (tb) |
||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 07/07 11:29 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS(Schaefer, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 07/07 7:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants and Plaintiff shall file their response (not to exceed 10 pages) to Defendant-Intervenor's Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record14 by July 17, 2017. Once the court rules on the pending motion the parties may submit a proposed briefing schedule for summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/7/17. (DJS) |
||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 07/05 4:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER: To the extent the Trustees of Princeton University or the Defendants object to the Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record14 filed by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC., they shall file a response by 7/10/17 of no more than ten pages. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/5/17. (DJS) |
||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/26 9:51 PM
MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.(Connolly, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Administrative Record
Fri 06/16 12:26 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Certified Index) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS. (Schaefer, Daniel) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/26 4:03 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS.(Schaefer, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 05/18 2:27 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Administrative Record due by 6/16/2017. Answer due by 5/26/2017. Summary Judgment motion due by 7/17/2017. Response/Cross Motion due by 9/1/2017. Response/Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/22/2017. Reply to Cross Motion due by 10/20/2017. Copy of administrative record cited by parties is due to the court by 11/3/2017. (tb) |
||
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Briefing Schedule
Wed 05/17 3:18 PM
Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.(Connolly, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Wed 05/17 3:11 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/24/2017. (Harrison, Lindsay) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Wed 05/17 3:09 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS served on 3/24/2017 (Harrison, Lindsay) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Wed 05/17 3:05 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/24/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/23/2017. (Harrison, Lindsay) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Wed 05/17 3:01 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 3/23/2017 (Harrison, Lindsay) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule
Wed 05/17 5:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting11 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. Defendant's Answer is due by 5/26/2017. Defendant shall certify and transmit the administrative record and file a certified list of the contents of the record by 6/16/2017. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due by 7/17/2017. Amicus briefs in support of Plaintiff's motion are due by 7/24/2017. Defendant's and Defendant-Intervenor's Combined Oppositions and Cross-Motions are due by 9/1/2017. Amicus briefs in support of Cross-Motions are due by 9/8/2017. Plaintiff's Combined Reply and Opposition is due by 9/22/2017. Defendant's and Defendant-Intervenor's Replies are due by 10/20/2017. Copy of the administrative record cited by parties is due to the court by 11/3/2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/17/2017. (lctsc2) |
||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Intervene Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Tue 05/09 11:33 AM
ORDER granting4 Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene as a Defendant in this action and granting4 the Consent Motion to Consolidate Cases. It is hereby ORDERED that cases No. 17-cv-0485-TSC and No. 16-cv-2154-TSC are CONSOLIDATED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/9/2017. (lctsc2) |
||
utility
Create Case Association
Tue 05/09 4:06 PM
Case consolidated with Lead Case no. 16-cv-2154 TSC. NO FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THIS CASE. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE LEAD NO. 16cv2154 TSC. (td) |
||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/04 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS (Schaefer, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/30 5:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.. (Connolly, John) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Intervene
Thu 03/30 5:54 PM
Consent MOTION to Intervene and Consolidate by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.(Connolly, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Answer, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Fri 03/17 4:49 PM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (md) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Consent | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Related Case
Fri 03/17 10:51 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. Case related to Case No. 16-cv-2154. (Harrison, Lindsay) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 10:47 AM
COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4879326) filed by TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY.(Harrison, Lindsay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/17 4:36 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (md) |