Horne v. Harbour Portfolio VII, LP et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard W Story |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00954 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:3601 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 07, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 5:27 AM EDT |
Cross Claimant
CWAM II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hamilton Green Crest
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JCT Capital, LLC.
|
|
Defendant
Investment Trading & Development
|
|
Defendant
National Asset Advisors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Orange Capital Funding, LLC.
|
|
Defendant
Harbour Portfolio VI, LP
Habour Portfolio VI, LP 8214 Westchester Drive, Suite 635
Dallas, TX 75225 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Harbour Portfolio VII, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CWAM II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Veronica R. Pitts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rohan Powell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerry White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laundra Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anita Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ola Elder Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael T. Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laquinta Hutchins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tabitha Hunter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Hunter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nina Horne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rita Henigan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Ellis-Blades
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Al Lee Butts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackie Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Demarkus R. Horne
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Cross Defendant
Harbour Portfolio VII, LP
Terminated: 09/05/2017
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Harbour Portfolio VI, LP
Terminated: 09/05/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SG Capital Partners
Terminated: 08/10/2017
|