Williams v. Johnson
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lisa G Wood |
Referred: | G R Smith |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00052 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Wed 07/05 10:52 AM
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to8 Order dated 6/30/17. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 7/5/2017. (ca) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/30 5:06 PM
ORDER ADOPTING3 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge as the opinion of the Court; denying as time barred7 Rule 35(a) MOTION to Correct Illegal Sentence. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 6/30/2017. (ca) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/19 10:27 AM
Rule 25(a) MOTION to Correct Illegal Sentence by Eric E Williams. Responses due by 6/2/2017. (loh) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Wed 05/10 2:14 PM
OBJECTION to3 Report and Recommendations by Eric E Williams. (loh) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 04/17 11:20 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eric E Williams. Objection due by 5/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/17/17. (loh) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 04/17 10:14 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eric E Williams. Responses due by 5/1/2017. REFERRED to Judge G. R. Smith.(loh) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/17 11:20 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eric E Williams. Objections to R&R due by 5/17/2017. (loh) |
||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 03/30 9:22 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Denying re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eric E Williams. Objections to R&R due by 4/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/29/17. (loh) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 03/17 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Compliance due by 4/7/2017.) Mailed to Eric E Williams #426879, Dooly State Prison, P O Box 750, Unadilla, GA 31091. (jlm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 03/17 1:31 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Eric E Williams.(jlm) |