Johnson v. Drew
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William T Moore, Jr |
Referred: | G R Smith |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00053 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judgment
Fri 06/23 4:57 PM
JUDGMENT entered dismissing Johnson's 2255 petition as successive. (loh) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/23 4:43 PM
ORDER ADOPTING re3 Report and Recommendations, dismissing this case as successive. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 6/23/17. (loh) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 04/19 2:13 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Dismissing re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Herbert Nathaniel Johnson. Objections to R&R due by 5/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/19/17. (loh) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 03/24 11:29 AM
Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number SAV028953. (loh) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 03/17 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (jlm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 03/17 1:59 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Herbert Nathaniel Johnson.(jlm) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 03/17 2:03 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/7/2017. Copy of2 mailed to Herbert Nathaniel Johnson #07593-085, 1006 Lynes Ave, Savannah, GA 31415. (jlm) |