Underwood v. REV Recreation Group, Inc. et al
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Theresa L Springmann |
Referred: | Susan L Collins |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00100 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 5:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
REV Recreation Group Inc
1031 US 224 E. Box 31
Decatur, IN 46733 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Manpower of Lansing Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamarcus Underwood
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Manpower of Indiana LP
Terminated: 05/25/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
utility
Dismissal Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 41a1
Thu 10/26 7:27 PM
CASE DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure pursuant to31 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. (lns) |
||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Stipulation to Dismiss
Mon 10/23 12:59 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Jamarcus Underwood. (Myers, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 10/19 3:37 PM
Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number INN1008144. (lhc) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 09/20 12:35 PM
ORDER FOR CHIEF JUDGE THERESA L SPRINGMANN: Pursuant to the27 Notice of Settlement filed by Jamarcus Underwood, Dismissal Papers DUE by 10/20/2017. The21 Motion to Dismiss and22 Motion for Hearing are RENDERED MOOT. (jlb) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order 1 - Terminate Hearings
Mon 08/14 1:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Based on the filing of the27 Notice of Resolution, the telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2017 at 10:45 am is hereby vacated. Text entry order.(mr) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 08/14 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Jamarcus Underwood (Myers, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 08/09 2:12 PM
ENTRY for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The25 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Dft's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Pla's Response to be filed by 8/14/2017. So Ordered. (lns) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/07 4:49 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Jamarcus Underwood. (Myers, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Certificate
Tue 08/01 2:57 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service . (Hammond, Clifford) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Brief in Support
Tue 07/25 2:13 PM
BRIEF in Support of21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Manpower of Lansing Inc. (Hammond, Clifford) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Hearing
Tue 07/25 9:27 AM
MOTION for Hearing re21 MOTION to Dismiss Request for Oral Argument by Defendant Manpower of Lansing Inc. (Hammond, Clifford) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss
Mon 07/24 4:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Manpower of Lansing Inc. (Hammond, Clifford) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated
Fri 07/14 1:26 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Hearing/Deadlines
Fri 07/14 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2017 10:45 PM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/29 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford L Hammond, III on behalf of Manpower of Lansing Inc (Hammond, Clifford) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 06/07 4:08 PM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint by REV Recreation Group Inc.(Scudder, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 06/06 10:47 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jamarcus Underwood. Manpower of Lansing Inc waiver sent on 5/25/2017, answer due 7/24/2017. (Myers, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 05/25 2:31 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Manpower of Lansing Inc, REV Recreation Group Inc filed by Jamarcus Underwood.(cer) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 05/25 2:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING13 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by Plaintiff Jamarcus Underwood. Clerk DIRECTED to show the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 5/25/17. (cer) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 05/25 12:58 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Jamarcus Underwood.(Myers, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Errata C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 05/25 2:04 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines per de11 : REV Recreation Group Inc answer due by 6/7/2017. (mc) |
||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/16 2:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by REV Recreation Group Inc identifying Corporate Parent REV Group Inc for REV Recreation Group Inc.. (Scudder, Mark) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer
Tue 05/16 2:04 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by REV Recreation Group Inc ; answer due by 6/7/2017. (Scudder, Mark) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/16 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D Scudder on behalf of REV Recreation Group Inc (Scudder, Mark) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/16 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanine M Gozdecki on behalf of REV Recreation Group Inc (Gozdecki, Jeanine) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 04/26 10:42 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jamarcus Underwood.(Myers, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/12 2:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Jamarcus Underwood. Manpower of Indiana LP served on 4/5/2017, answer due 4/26/2017. (lhc) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/12 2:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Jamarcus Underwood. REV Recreation Group, Inc. served on 4/5/2017, answer due 4/26/2017. (lhc) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:29 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Manpower of Indiana LP, REV Recreation Group, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (cc: USMS)..(cer) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 03/22 12:21 PM
ORDER GRANTING2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Jamarcus Underwood. Payment of the filing fee is DEFERRED. Plaintiff ORDERED to pay the filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in case. United States Marshal's Service DIRECTED to effect service of process on Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 3/22/17. (cc: USMS). (cer) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/17 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ilene M Smith on behalf of Jamarcus Underwood (Smith, Ilene) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/17 8:51 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jamarcus Underwood. (Myers, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 8:51 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Jamarcus Underwood.(Myers, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons USM285s | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 03/17 9:34 AM
Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE, IFP PENDING) (mlc) |