Garrelts v. Commissioner of Social Security
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Eric I Long |
Referred: | Eric I Long |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02059 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 09/20 11:04 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/20/2017. Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal16 and Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this matter is hereby terminated. All pending motions are denied as moot and all scheduled deadlines and court settings are vacated. (DS, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/19 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dawn R Garrelts. (Sutterfield, David) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 08/21 10:41 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/21/2017. Plaintiff's Amended First Motion for Extension of Time by Agreement15 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to file her motion for summary judgment and memorandum is extended to September 20, 2017. Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension of Time14 is DENIED as moot. (DS, ilcd) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl)
Mon 08/21 10:42 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/20/2017. (DS, ilcd) |
||
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 08/18 7:54 AM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Plaintiff Dawn R Garrelts. Responses due by 9/1/2017 (Sutterfield, David) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 08/18 7:39 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Plaintiff Dawn R Garrelts. Responses due by 9/1/2017 (Sutterfield, David) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Local Rule 8.1E
Fri 07/21 12:23 PM
Local Rule 8.1E regarding Motions for Summary Judgment delivered to counsel by way of e-filing. Motions due by 8/21/2017. (DS, ilcd) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Transcript (Social Security)
Fri 07/21 11:24 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT.(Hoff, David) |
|
Att: 1 402-462, | ||
Att: 2 463-488, | ||
Att: 3 489-604, | ||
Att: 4 605-721, | ||
Att: 5 722-863, | ||
Att: 6 864-1024, | ||
Att: 7 1025-1188, | ||
Att: 8 1189-1311, | ||
Att: 9 1312-1358 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Transcript (Social Security)
Fri 07/21 11:09 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT.(Hoff, David) |
|
Att: 1 19-47, | ||
Att: 2 48-78, | ||
Att: 3 79-117, | ||
Att: 4 118-151, | ||
Att: 5 152-175, | ||
Att: 6 176-201, | ||
Att: 7 202-231, | ||
Att: 8 232-288, | ||
Att: 9 289-312 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/21 10:57 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Commissioner of Social Security.(Hoff, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/28 4:47 PM
ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/28/17. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long (SKR, ilcd) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/28 1:57 PM
PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Hoff, David) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 06/22 1:47 PM
PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Sutterfield, David) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Return of Service Executed
Tue 05/02 10:19 AM
Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security (for US Attorney General) on 4/25/2017. (KM, ilcd) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA-IFP GRANTED
Fri 03/24 11:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/24/2017, answer due 7/24/2017. (Service packet mailed to USM for service on AG.) (TC, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/24 11:41 AM
ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/24/17. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees2 is GRANTED. The US Marshal is directed to service the complaint and summons on Defendant. See written Order. (Consent packet attached.) (TC, ilcd) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Fri 03/17 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David Sutterfield on behalf of Dawn R. Garrelts (Sutterfield, David) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/17 1:41 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dawn R. Garrelts. Responses due by 3/31/2017 (Sutterfield, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Attorney Complaint
Fri 03/17 1:39 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dawn R. Garrelts.(Sutterfield, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Interest, | ||
Att: 3 Summons 1, | ||
Att: 4 Summons 2, | ||
Att: 5 Summons 3, | ||
Att: 6 USM 285 - 1, | ||
Att: 7 USM 285 - 2, | ||
Att: 8 USM 285 - 3 |