Jones v. United States of America
Iowa Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Jarvey |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00103 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice - Other
Fri 01/13 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Mandate 22-3211 from the 8th CCA. (vr) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice - Other
Fri 01/13 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Judgment 22-3211 from the 8th CCA advising motion for authorization to file a successive habeas application is denied. Mandate shall issue forthwith. (vr) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 11/26 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Mandate 18-3178 from the 8th CCA. (vr) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 11/26 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Judgment 18-3178 from the 8th CCA advising the petition for authorization to file a successive habeas application in the district court is denied. Mandate shall issue forthwith. (vr) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
Notice of Supreme Court Filing
Thu 03/08 8:00 AM
Notice of Supreme Court Filing advising the petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.(vr) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
Notice of Supreme Court Filing
Tue 02/13 12:45 PM
Notice of Supreme Court Filing(vr) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 01/03 8:33 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to5 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexandra Jones, Jr. (vr) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
USCA Opinion/Judgment
Thu 11/02 1:10 PM
JUDGMENT of USCA advising certificate of appealability is denied and the appeal is dismissed as to5 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexandra Jones, Jr. Mandate to issue in 45 days. (vr) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Certificate of Appealability
Tue 06/20 12:06 PM
ORDER denying4 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 6/20/2017. (mem) |
|
8 | 8
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 06/20 12:04 PM
ORDER of USCA to submit documents as to5 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexandra Jones, Jr. (vr) |
|
7 | 7
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 06/20 12:02 PM
USCA Case Number 17-2358 for5 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexandra Jones, Jr. (vr) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
appeal
Notification of Appeal to USCA
Mon 06/19 11:01 AM
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA Supplement by District Court Clerk to USCA re5 Notice of Appeal filed on 6/12/2017. (vr) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 06/13 7:28 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to3 Judgment,2 Order by Alexandra Jones, Jr. (bp ) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Certificate of Appealability
Tue 06/13 7:27 AM
MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Alexandra Jones, Jr. Responses due by 6/19/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (bp ) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judgment
Thu 04/27 3:14 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Alexandra Jones, Jr. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 4/27/2017. (don, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Tue 04/25 3:23 PM
ORDER Dismissing1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Alexandra Jones, Jr. The clerk shall enter judgment in favor of the respondent. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 4/25/2017. (mem) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255
Fri 03/17 4:48 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Alexandra Jones, Jr. (rmj) |
|
Att: 1 Brief and Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |