Wells, Jr. v. Kansas Counselors Inc. et al
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | John W Lungstrum |
Referred: | Gerald L Rushfelt |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02163 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:21 AM CDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kansas Counselors Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wesley C. Wells, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 11/20 3:32 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Wesley C. Wells, Jr. (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
order
Administratively Closing Case
Mon 10/23 2:39 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Parties shall file stipulation of dismissal by November 30, 2017. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/23/17. (kao) |
|
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 10/23 9:49 AM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Wesley C. Wells, Jr (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 10/20 11:19 AM
ORDER granting35 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall file any motion to compel Defendant Equifax's discovery responses on or before October 20, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 10/20/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ko) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/10 2:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents and Requests for Admission to Plaintiff by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Zorogastua, Guillermo) |
|
37 | 37
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 10/10 1:34 PM
ANSWER to30 Amended Complaint and Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Zorogastua, Guillermo) |
|
36 | 36
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 10/10 10:50 AM
ANSWER to30 Amended Complaint by Kansas Counselors Inc..(Henderson, William) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 10/06 8:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file a motion to compel Defendant Equifax's discovery responses (Second) by Plaintiff Wesley C. Wells, Jr (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 10/05 3:01 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kendall W. Carter for Equifax Information Services, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 10/5/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
support
Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion
Tue 10/03 2:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Kendall W. Carter re32 MOTION for attorney Kendall W. Carter to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4294301.) by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC(Zorogastua, Guillermo) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/03 2:37 PM
MOTION for attorney Kendall W. Carter to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4294301.) by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Zorogastua, Guillermo) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 09/26 2:16 PM
ORDER granting29 Unopposed Second Motion to Extend Time to File a Motion to Compel Defendant Equifax's Discovery Responses. Defendant does not oppose the motion. Plaintiff shall file any motions to compel discovery responses on or before October 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 09/26/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ko) |
|
30 | 30
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 09/26 11:24 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Kansas Counselors Inc., filed by Wesley C. Wells, Jr.(Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 09/22 9:14 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file a motion to compel Defendant Equifax's discovery responses (Second) by Plaintiff Wesley C. Wells, Jr (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion to Amend Complaint
Thu 09/21 4:47 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Amend Complaint re Notice of Removal. Defendants did not respond to Plaintiff's motion, and the time to do so has now passed. Because the motion is unopposed and for good cause under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2), the Court grants the motion. Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint on or before September 29, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 09/21/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ko) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 09/20 9:29 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting26 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Neither Defendant opposed the respective motion. As to Defendant Equifax, Plaintiff shall file any motions to compel discovery responses on or before September 22, 2017. As to Defendant Kansas Counselors Inc., Plaintiff shall file any motions to compel discovery responses on or before September 29, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 09/20/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ko) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 09/18 10:02 PM
Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file motion to compel Defendant Kansas Counselors Inc.'s discovery responses by Plaintiff Wesley C. Wells, Jr (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 09/07 10:02 PM
Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file a motion to compel Defendant Equifax's discovery responses by Plaintiff Wesley C. Wells, Jr (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
support
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 08/22 5:30 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of23 MOTION to Amend Complaint re1 Notice of Removal, by Plaintiff Wesley C. Wells, Jr(Stecklein, Alan) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Amend Complaint
Tue 08/22 5:25 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint re1 Notice of Removal, by Plaintiff Wesley C. Wells, Jr (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint Proposed Amended Complaint | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Protective Order
Fri 08/18 8:05 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 8/17/2017. (ydm) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/16 5:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Kansas Counselors Inc.s Answers and Objections to Plaintiffs Interrogatories and Responses to Plaintiffs Request for Production by Kansas Counselors Inc.. (Henderson, William) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 08/10 2:47 PM
ORDER granting18 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Mediation and Designation of Mediator. The parties seek an extension of the September 27, 2017 mediation deadline set forth in the Scheduling Order because of scheduling conflicts. For good cause, the Court grants the parties' motion and extends the deadline for completion of mediation to October 12, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 8/10/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gt) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/09 3:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Zorogastua, Guillermo) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 08/08 3:23 PM
Joint MOTION for extension of time to complete mediation by Plaintiff Wesley C. Wells, Jr (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/11 2:40 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 11/22/2017. Dispositive motion deadline 12/22/2017. Mediation deadline 9/27/2017. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 7/27/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/7/2017. Jury Trial set for 7/9/2018 at 09:30 AM in KC Courtroom 440 (JWL) before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Estimated trial time 4 days Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2017 at 02:15 PM by Telephone GLR - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 8533057 before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 7/11/17. (yh) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 07/05 8:56 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/27/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (yh) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 06/27 3:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of discovery requests to Defendant Kansas Counselors Inc. by Wesley C. Wells, Jr. (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 06/27 3:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of discovery requests to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Wesley C. Wells, Jr. (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/15 4:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Zorogastua, Guillermo) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 06/13 3:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Kansas Counselors Inc.. (Henderson, William) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 06/13 3:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by Wesley C. Wells, Jr. (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling
Mon 04/17 2:55 PM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2017 at 11:15 AM by Telephone before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Counsel and any pro se parties should call 1-888-363-4749, access code 8533057, for the conference. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/13/2017. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 4/17/2017. (ydm) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/24 4:19 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Kansas Counselors Inc..(Henderson, William) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/24 3:12 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Equifax Inc. as corporate parent (Zorogastua, Guillermo) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/24 3:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Zorogastua, Guillermo) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Jury Demand
Mon 03/20 2:07 PM
DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Wesley C. Wells, Jr.. (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
5 | 5
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED
Mon 03/20 1:50 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Wesley C. Wells, Jr. upon Kansas Counselors Inc. and Equifax Information Services, LLC (Stecklein, Alan) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/17 12:22 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kansas Counselors Inc. identifying n/a as corporate parent . (Henderson, William) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Designation of Place of Trial
Fri 03/17 12:21 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Kansas Counselors Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Henderson, William) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 03/17 12:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Kansas Counselors Inc.. (Henderson, William) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/17 12:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas, case number 2017-LM-000896 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4123802.), filed by Kansas Counselors Inc..(Henderson, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court File, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal to State Court, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Joinder In & Consent of Defendant Equifax | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 03/17 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm) |