Leading Edge Aerospace, LLC v. Stratasys, Inc.
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Eric F Melgren |
Referred: | James P O'Hara |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-01062 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:03 AM CDT |
Defendant
Stratasys, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leading Edge Aerospace, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 08/16 8:02 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per 11 Stipulation of Dismissal. (sz) |
||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 08/15 4:52 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Stratasys, Inc.. (Honeyman, Richard) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Cancelling Deadline ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Mon 07/31 4:29 PM
ORDER CANCELING HEARING: Counsel has informed the court that this case has settled. The scheduling conference set for August 8, 2017, is cancelled. At counsel's request, the deadline for the parties to file the stipulation of dismissal is extended to August 8, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/31/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(amh) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 06/26 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2017 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. All counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. The parties advise the case is almost settled. The stipulation of dismissal OR the planning report is due 8/1/17. (ss) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Setting Scheduling Conference
Tue 05/23 9:16 AM
INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/5/2017 at 09:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. All participants must call the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 8914911 for the conference. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/26/2017. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/23/17. (ss) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/17 4:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Stratasys, Inc..(Honeyman, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/26 1:56 PM
ORDER granting5 unopposed motion for extension of time until May 17, 2017, for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/26/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 04/26 1:39 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Stratasys, Inc. (Honeyman, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer
Tue 04/11 10:02 AM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until April 26, 2017 for Defendant Stratasys, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 04/11/2017. (cv) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Entry of Appearance
Thu 04/06 3:03 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Richard L. Honeyman on behalf of Stratasys, Inc.. (Honeyman, Richard) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 03/17 10:49 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Leading Edge Aerospace, LLC. (Rathbun, Randall) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (attorney)
Fri 03/17 10:49 AM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4123632.), filed by Leading Edge Aerospace, LLC.(Rathbun, Randall) |
|
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 03/17 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sz) |
||
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 11:35 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stratasys, Inc.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (sz) |