Miller-Parker v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | John W Lungstrum |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-01063 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2018 |
Defendant
Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
|
|
Interested Party
Social Security Regional Administrator
|
|
Plaintiff
Deanna Miller-Parker
|
Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Judgment
Wed 05/30 9:57 AM
JUDGMENT- Judgment is entered pursuant to the fourth sentence of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) AFFIRMING the Commissioner's final decision. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/30/2018. Mailed to pro se party Deanna Miller Parker by regular mail. (ydm) |
|
24 | 24
7
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Wed 05/30 9:08 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is ORDERED that judgment shall be entered pursuant to the fourth sentence of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) AFFIRMING the Commissioner's final decision. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/30/2018. (ses) |
|
notice
Notice Re Pro Se Mailing
Wed 05/30 9:09 AM
NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document24 Memorandum & Order mailed to Deanna Miller-Parker on 5/30/2018 by regular mail. (ses) |
||
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Reassigning Case
Wed 02/07 3:08 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all further proceedings. District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree no longer assigned to case Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/07/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) |
|
notice
Notice Re Pro Se Mailing
Wed 02/07 3:14 PM
NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 23 Order Reassigning Case, mailed to Deanna Miller-Parker on 2/7/2018 by regular mail. (ses) |
||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Exhibits
Thu 01/18 3:41 PM
EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of20 Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief. (sz) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Social Security - Commissioners Response Brief
Fri 12/22 1:01 PM
COMMISSIONER'S RESPONSE BRIEF by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Jacobs, Michelle) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief
Tue 11/28 1:11 PM
PLAINTIFF'S SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEF by Deanna Miller-Parker.(sz) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 11/02 2:59 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying18 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Opening Brief due by 12/1/2017. Plaintiff must file her opening brief on or before December 1, 2017, or her case will be dismissed. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 11/2/2017. Mailed to pro se party Deanna Miller Parker by regular mail. (sz) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Reconsideration Extension of Time
Tue 10/31 2:59 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION for extension of time ( Response deadline 11/14/2017). (Titled "Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration") by Plaintiff Deanna Miller-Parker. (sz) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Response to Order to Show Cause
Tue 10/31 2:55 PM
RESPONSE re16 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Deanna Miller-Parker.(sz) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Show Cause
Thu 10/19 5:18 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff shall show cause to this court no later than November 8, 2017, why the court should not dismiss her case under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) and D. Kan. Rule 41.1 because of plaintiff's failure to prosecute the case. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/19/2017. Mailed to pro se party Deanna Miller-Parker by regular mail. (mig) |
|
15 | 15
8
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Hearing
Thu 10/19 5:09 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting12 Motion to Dismiss; denying14 Motion for Hearing. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/19/2017. Mailed to pro se party Deanna Miller-Parker by regular mail. (mig) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Hearing
Fri 08/25 4:04 PM
MOTION for Hearing by Plaintiff Deanna Miller-Parker. (Titled "Plaintiff's Argumentation and Authority") (sz) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 08/25 3:59 PM
RESPONSE by Plaintiff Deanna Miller-Parker re12 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Motion to Dismiss) (Titled "Plaintiff's Motion to Deny Dismissal") (sz) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss
Thu 08/10 9:58 AM
MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Motion to Dismiss) by Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Jacobs, Michelle) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Social Security Administrative Record
Mon 07/03 3:19 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD - Certified copy of transcript of record re10 Answer to Complaint by Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Jacobs, Michelle) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/03 3:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of.(Jacobs, Michelle) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer
Fri 06/16 4:16 PM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/3/2017 for Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (U.S. Attorney-KS) to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/16/2017. Mailed to pro se party Deanna Miller-Parker by regular mail. (mam) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice Re Pro Se Mailing
Wed 05/31 9:16 AM
NOTICE Re Pro Se Mailing: Documents6 ,7 , and8 mailed to Deanna Miller-Parker on 5/31/2017 by regular mail. (mam) |
||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Return of Service of Summons as to USAG/ORC
Tue 05/02 10:56 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons issued to US Attorney General served on 4/21/2017 by certified mail, filed by Plaintiff Deanna Miller-Parker. (mam) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Return of Service of Summons as to USAG/ORC
Wed 04/26 2:55 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons issued to Office of Regional Counsel served on 4/19/2017 by certified mail, filed by Plaintiff Deanna Miller-Parker. (mam) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA
Tue 04/25 11:54 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- PERSONAL SERVICE by Deanna Miller-Parker upon Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (U.S. Attorney-KS) served on 4/18/2017, answer due 6/19/2017. (mam) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Thu 04/06 10:29 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ; denying4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 4/6/2017.Mailed to pro se party Deanna Miller-Parker by regular mail. (sz) |
|
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 04/06 11:30 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Office of Regional Counsel), U.S. Attorney-KS and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service). Notice sent to pro se party Deanna Miller-Parker by regular mail. (mam) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 03/17 11:28 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Deanna Miller-Parker (sz) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/17 11:27 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Deanna Miller-Parker (sz) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Affidavit | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 03/17 11:26 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Deanna Miller-Parker. (sz) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 11:25 AM
COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Wichita, filed by Deanna Miller-Parker.(sz) |
|
utility
Motions No Longer Referred
Fri 03/17 2:31 PM
MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED. Judge Birzer was added to this case in error. Social Security Appeals are not generally assigned to a magistrate judge. The referral has been removed and the motions are referred to Judge Crabtree. Re: 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy., 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (cs) |