Daigre v. Humana Health Plan, Inc. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susie Morgan |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02238 |
Nature of Suit | 151 Contract - Medicare Act |
Cause | 42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:01 AM CDT |
Defendant
Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Humana Health Plan, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bennie Daigre
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Humana Health Plan of Louisiana, Inc.
Terminated: 03/20/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 05/11 5:40 PM
ORDER granting13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/11/2017.(clc) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 05/11 2:06 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case by All Parties.(Rush, Layna) Modified on 5/11/2017 to include plaintiff as a filer (tsf) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Set Hearings
Wed 04/26 4:57 PM
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Preliminary Conference set for 6/29/2017 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Thu 04/13 9:20 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . **Filing attorney should have selected No at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 5/17/2017 before Judge Susie Morgan as indicated on the attached Notice of Submission. In addition, the filing attorney incorrectly selected Humana Health Plan of Louisiana, Inc. a terminated party as a filer. Clerk took corrective action by removing the incorrect filer. No further action is necessary.** (clc) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6) Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 04/12 3:45 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc., Humana Health Plan of Louisiana, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc..(Rush, Layna) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Submission | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 03/27 4:25 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc. answer due 4/14/2017; Humana Health Plan, Inc. answer due 4/14/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/27/2017. (clc) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Mon 03/27 2:23 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re7 Response/Reply.**Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action by either re-docketing the event or changing the event.** (clc) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Response/Reply
Mon 03/27 10:36 AM
Notice of Compliance by Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc. to3 Directive(Rush, Layna) Modified on 3/27/2017 (clc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
6 | 6
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Mon 03/27 10:19 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer .**Filing attorney incorrectly selected Humana Health Plan of Louisiana, Inc a terminated party as a filer. Clerk took corrective action.** (clc) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 03/24 3:34 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc., Humana Health Plan of Louisiana, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc..Attorney Layna Cook Rush added to party Humana Health Plan of Louisiana, Inc.(pty:dft).(Rush, Layna) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Wed 03/22 11:34 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Humana Inc. for Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc. (Rush, Layna) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Mon 03/20 9:03 AM
Directives pursuant to 28:1447(b) By Clerk.(cg) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 03/20 8:29 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (djg) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/17 9:19 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, case number 768-590 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6030296) filed by Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc..Attorney Layna Cook Rush added to party Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Layna Cook Rush added to party Humana Health Plan, Inc.(pty:dft).(Rush, Layna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |