Lopez v. ASJ Construction Group, LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susie Morgan |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02241 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:0207 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:30 AM CDT |
Defendant
ASJ Construction Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alfonso Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lidio Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Eider Construction, L.L.C.
202 S. Genois St.
New Orleans, LA 70119 |
|
Third Party Defendant
Eider Lopez
202 S. Genois St.
New Orleans, LA 70119 |
|
Third Party Plaintiff
ASJ Construction Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Alfonso Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Thu 07/19 4:36 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 07/18 12:06 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Case With Prejudice by Lidio Lopez.(Westermeier, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 06/11 11:27 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE - IT IS ORDERED that this action be and is hereby dismissed as to all parties, without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown, within sixty days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. In addition, the Court specifically retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement if settlement is not consummated within sixty days. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/11/2018.(sa) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/31 12:35 PM
ORDER re28 Witness and Exhibit List filed by Lidio Lopez - IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiff file amended witness and exhibit lists incorporating the requirements described herein by Thursday, June 7, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendants file witness and exhibit lists that comply with the Court's requirements by Thursday, June 7, 2018, or they will be prohibited from calling witnesses or introducing exhibits at trial. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
trial
Witness and Exhibit List
Tue 05/29 5:54 PM
Witness and Exhibit List by Lidio Lopez. (Westermeier, Emily) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Compliance
Wed 11/15 10:57 AM
Notice of Compliance by Lidio Lopez re23 Order on Motion to Certify Class. (Westermeier, Emily) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Show Cause Hearing
Thu 11/09 1:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Show Cause Hearing held on 11/9/2017. The Court noted on the record that the Court is not in receipt of any undeliverable mail as to Mr. Eider Lopez and that he failed to appear on this date as previously ordered . (Court Reporter Mary Thompson.) (bwn) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 10/25 5:05 PM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER: ORDERED that Eider Lopez, both individually and as representative for Eider Construction, L.L.C., appear on Thursday, November 9, 2017 at 9:00 a.m., and show cause why he has not responded to requests for information, including names and addresses of members of the conditionally certified class in this matter. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/25/2017.(clc) |
|
24 | 24
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 10/25 5:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Status Conference held on 10/25/2017. (clc) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Certify Class
Wed 09/13 1:38 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/13/2017. (clc) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order Set Hearings
Wed 08/23 10:01 AM
ORDER that a Settlement Conference is set for 7/11/2018 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 8/22/2017.(caa) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Wed 08/23 9:49 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ASJ Construction Group, LLC (Siemssen, Jeffrey) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/23 9:43 AM
NOTICE by ASJ Construction Group, LLC, Alfonso Sanchez Lead Counsel . (Siemssen, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 08/17 11:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/25/2017 at 1:30 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2018 at 1:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. 5 day Jury Trial set for 8/27/2018 at 9:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. All discovery must be completed by 6/19/2018.(bwn) |
|
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form | ||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Certify Class
Wed 08/16 4:29 PM
MOTION to Certify Class by Lidio Lopez. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/6/2017.(Westermeier, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Lopez Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Discovery Responses, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Class Notice, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Class Notice in Spanish, | ||
Att: 7 Notice of Submission | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Set Hearings
Tue 07/25 4:31 PM
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2017 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Tue 07/25 4:08 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Entry of Default as to Eider Construction, L.L.C. and Eider Lopez. Signed by Clerk. (bwn) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 07/25 12:10 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re14 MOTION for Default Judgment. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion for Entry of Default. Clerk took corrective action by either re-docketing the event or changing the event.** (clc) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 07/24 3:59 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Default Judgment as to Eider Construction LLC and Eider Lopez by ASJ Construction Group, LLC.(Siemssen, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 07/11 4:50 PM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER: ORDERED that the third party plaintiffs move for entry of default against the said third party defendants under Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or show good cause in writing within 20 days why these third party defendants should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/11/2017.(clc) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 06/20 4:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Eider Lopez served on 6/18/2017, answer due 7/10/2017.(Siemssen, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Proof of Service | ||
11 | 11
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 06/20 10:55 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re9 Summons Returned Executed. **Filing attorney entered incorrect service date for parties served. Eider Construction, L.L.C. served on 6/18/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. No further action is necessary.** (clc) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/19 4:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Eider Lopez served on 6/8/2017, answer due 6/29/2017.(Siemssen, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Proof of Service | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/19 4:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Eider Construction, L.L.C. served on 6/8/2017, answer due 6/29/2017.(Siemssen, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/09 12:48 PM
Summons Issued as to Eider Construction, L.L.C., Eider Lopez.(clc) |
|
Att: 1 Third Party Summons | ||
7 | 7
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 05/09 12:38 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re6 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint. ** Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section E and Magistrate 4. In addition, filing attorney did not select Alfonso Sanchez as a filer. Clerk added filer.** (clc) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint
Mon 05/08 10:19 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Eider Construction, L.L.C., Eider Lopez by ASJ Construction Group, LLC, Alfonso Sanchez. Attorney Jeffrey M. Siemssen added to party ASJ Construction Group, LLC(pty:dft).(Siemssen, Jeffrey) Modified text on 5/9/2017 (clc) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 05/01 9:20 AM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER: ORDERED that the plaintiff move for entry of default against the said defendants under Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or show good cause in writing within 20 days why that defendants should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. If counsel for plaintiff fails to move for entry of default or show good cause in writing, the aforementioned defendants will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute without further notice in accordance with Rule 16(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/28/2017.(clc) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/31 1:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; ASJ Construction Group, LLC served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017; Alfonso Sanchez served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017.(Westermeier, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Executed | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 9:23 AM
Summons Issued as to ASJ Construction Group, LLC, Alfonso Sanchez.(cg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 03/20 8:51 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (djg) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 10:38 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against ASJ Construction Group, LLC, Alfonso Sanchez (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6030614) filed by Lidio Lopez.Attorney Emily Westermeier added to party Lidio Lopez(pty:pla).(Westermeier, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Notice of Consent |