Gomez v. MLM Remodeling, LLC, et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nannette Jolivette Brown |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02244 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:0216(b) Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:36 AM CDT |
Defendant
MLM Remodeling, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
N & T Improvements, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mykola Udych
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Santos Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Tue 05/08 2:35 PM
ORDER GRANTING20 Motion to Dismiss Case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any and all claims of the Plaintiff, Santos Gomez against Defendants, MLM Remodeling, LLC, N&T Improvements, LLC, and Mykola Udych, be and are hereby dismissed, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 5/8/2018. (mmv) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 05/07 9:34 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Case by Santos Gomez.(Beaumont, William) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 01/22 1:09 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/22/2018.(caa) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Wed 11/15 3:47 PM
STATUS REPORT by MLM Remodeling, LLC, N&T Improvements, LLC, and Mykola Udych and by Santos Gomez (Westermeier, Emily) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Status Report
Fri 09/15 2:10 PM
STATUS REPORT by MLM Remodeling, LLC, N&T Improvements, LLC, and Mykola Udych and by Santos Gomez (Westermeier, Emily) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Status Report
Fri 07/14 1:52 PM
STATUS REPORT by Defendants MLM Remodeling, LLC, N&T Improvements, LLC, and Mykola Udych and by Santos Gomez (Westermeier, Emily) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/23 2:27 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to1 Complaint, by MLM Remodeling, LLC, N & T Improvements, LLC, Mykola Udych. (jls) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 06/23 2:22 PM
ORDER GRANTING12 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/23/2017. (jls) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Fri 06/23 7:46 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re12 Answer to1 Complaint. **1) Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION for Leave to File. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. **2) The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word 'Proposed' but only reflect 'Order' on the actual document.** (mmv) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/22 4:45 PM
First Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint, by MLM Remodeling, LLC, N & T Improvements, LLC, Mykola Udych.(Marullo, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Certificate of Consent of Opposing Counsel | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/15 4:42 PM
Defendants' Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint, by MLM Remodeling, LLC, N & T Improvements, LLC, Mykola Udych.(Marullo, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/15 11:52 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2018 4:00 PM before Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Jury Trial set for 7/30/2018 9:00 AM before Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Issued by Clerk for Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(jrc) |
|
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form, | ||
Att: 2 Standing Order | ||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 05/08 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2017 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/02 11:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by MLM Remodeling, LLC, N & T Improvements, LLC, Mykola Udych.(Marullo, Dawn) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Fri 04/21 10:41 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . **1) Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. **2) Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1.** (mmv) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/21 10:42 AM
ORDER GRANTING5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Defendants, MLM Remodeling, LLC, N&T Improvements, LLC, and Mykola Udych, are granted an extension of twenty-one (21) days, or until May 2, 2017, within which to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 4/20/2017. (mmv) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/20 2:15 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by MLM Remodeling, LLC, N & T Improvements, LLC, Mykola Udych.Attorney Dawn Danna Marullo added to party MLM Remodeling, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dawn Danna Marullo added to party N & T Improvements, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dawn Danna Marullo added to party Mykola Udych(pty:dft).(Marullo, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/24 3:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; MLM Remodeling, LLC served on 3/21/2017, answer due 4/11/2017; N & T Improvements, LLC served on 3/21/2017, answer due 4/11/2017; Mykola Udych served on 3/21/2017, answer due 4/11/2017.(Westermeier, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Executed, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Executed | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 10:11 AM
Summons Issued as to MLM Remodeling, LLC, N & T Improvements, LLC, Mykola Udych.(mmv) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 03/20 8:56 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (djg) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 11:35 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against MLM Remodeling, LLC, N & T Improvements, LLC, Mykola Udych (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6030883) filed by Santos Gomez.Attorney Emily Westermeier added to party Santos Gomez(pty:pla).(Westermeier, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Notice of Consent |