Davis v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02247 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 13, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:32 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Janie Davis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago |
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/13 2:08 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE originally filed in Master Case 14-md-2592 as rec doc 17741. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2020.(jeg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 03/21 11:18 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 4:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC. (am) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 03/17 2:20 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 12:24 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6031072) filed by Janie Davis.Attorney Joseph Tapp Waechter added to party Janie Davis(pty:pla).(Waechter, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons |