Champion Foods, Inc. v. Precise Commodities et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susie Morgan |
Referred: | Daniel E Knowles, III |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02248 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:1391 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:12 AM CDT |
Defendant
Edward Forte
|
|
Defendant
Precise Commodities
|
|
Plaintiff
Champion Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/14 4:03 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: ORDERED that the plaintiff's claims against the aforementioned defendants are dismissed without prejudice in accordance with Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/14/2017.(clc) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 06/20 1:47 PM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff show good cause in writing within twenty days why service of process has not been effected, or the unserved defendants will be dismissed without notice. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/20/2017.(clc) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/04 9:23 AM
Summons Issued as to Edward Forte, Precise Commodities.(clc) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
5 | 5
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Thu 05/04 9:23 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re4 Summons Submitted for Issuance,3 Summons Submitted for Issuance. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (clc) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Wed 05/03 12:07 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Tobler, Chadwick) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Wed 05/03 12:03 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Tobler, Chadwick) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 03/20 9:02 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (djg) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6031210) filed by Champion Foods, Inc..Attorney Chadwick A. Tobler added to party Champion Foods, Inc.(pty:pla).(Tobler, Chadwick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |