Brown v. American River Transportation Company, LLC
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02255 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 46:30104 Marine Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 24, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
American River Transportation Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Brown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
83 | 83
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Mon 10/29 3:40 PM
ORDER granting81 Motion to Dismiss Case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this matter, including all claims and demands made therein, be and it is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/29/2018. (sa) |
|
82 | 82
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Mon 10/29 9:44 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re81 MOTION to Dismiss. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Dismiss Case. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (mm) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
81 | 81
motion
Dismiss
Fri 10/26 8:05 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by American River Transportation Company, LLC.(Brackett, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |