Compton v. Moncla Companies, LLC
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Barry W Ashe |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02258 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 00:0000 Cause Code Unknown |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Apr 20, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:01 AM CDT |
Defendant
Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C.
|
|
Plaintiff
James Compton
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Moncla Companies LLC
Terminated: 07/26/2017
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, November 10, 2022 | ||
148 | 148
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 11/10 12:07 PM
ORDER granting146 Motion for Final Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/10/2022. (ko) |
|
147 | 147
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Thu 11/10 9:55 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re146 Joint MOTION for Final Dismissal with Prejudice: 1. Filing attorney incorrectly associated themselves with a party they do not represent. When filing a joint motion, check or uncheck the appropriate box when prompted 'The following attorney/party associations do not exist for the above case(s). Please check the box on the left of the screen for associations which should be created. If the association should not be created, be sure the box is unchecked.' Clerk has deleted attorney from party they do not represent. No further action is necessary. 2. Filing attorney incorrectly selected Lloyd's Underwriters and Moncla Companies LLC as filers. Clerk took corrective action. (ko) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2022 | ||
146 | 146
motion
Dismiss
Wed 11/09 1:52 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss by James Compton, Moncla Marine Operations, LLC and by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, Lloyd's Underwriters, Markel America Insurance Company, Mitsui Sumimoto Ins. Co. of America, Moncla Companies LLC, Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C., Navigators Insurance Company, State National Insurance Company, Swiss Re International SE, United States Fire Insurance Company.Attorney Craig Wren Brewer added to party Lloyd's Underwriters(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Wren Brewer added to party Moncla Companies LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Wren Brewer added to party Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Brewer, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |