Miller v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02265 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:12 AM CDT |
Defendant
Aventis Pharma S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi Aventis US LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Plaintiff
Charity Miller
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Taxotere Amended Complaint
Mon 12/04 2:04 PM
Second AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT by Carl Miller. Party Hospira Worldwide, LLC and Hospira Inc. added. (per order doc 16606 in 16-md-2740) (cs) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 05/21 4:06 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Taxotere Amended Complaint
Wed 05/31 5:08 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT by Charity Miller. (Fraxedas, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 04/11 3:21 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 03/21 8:42 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re2 Notice of Appearance - Document has been stricken. Notice of Appearance should not be filed in member cases. All attorneys listed on the Complaint have been added as counsel of record. No further action is necessary. (tm) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 12:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi Aventis US LLC, Sanofi S.A..(tm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 03/17 3:24 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/17 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Richard Fraxedas on behalf of CHARITY A. MILLER. (Fraxedas, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6031677) filed by CHARITY A. MILLER.Attorney Jason Richard Fraxedas added to party CHARITY A. MILLER(pty:pla).(Fraxedas, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons |