Mancino v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02266 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:21 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Mancino
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 08/14 3:40 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE originally filed in Master Case 14-md-2592 as rec doc 17741. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2020.(jeg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 12/19 9:25 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re14 Affidavit of Service,15 Affidavit of Service. ****For future filings, summons returned should not be filed in the record unless it becomes necessary per Pretrial Order 16, document #898 in MDL 14-2592 ** (mmv) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 12/15 12:35 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Marian Zwierzynski of Summons and Complaint served on Janssen Research & Development LLC fka Johnson and Johnson Research and Development LLC on November 22, 2017. (Roman, Jose) |
|
14 | 14
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 12/15 12:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Marian Zwierzynski of Summons and Complaint served on Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. fka Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. fka Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. co Johnson & Johnson on November 29, 2017. (Roman, Jose) |
|
Friday, November 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Fri 11/24 7:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (mmv) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Wed 11/22 9:39 AM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Roman, Jose) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 11/22 8:14 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re10 Request for Summons Issued.**Clerk was unable to issue requested Summons, as Janssen Research & Development, Inc., is an unnamed party.** (ss) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Request for Summons Issued
Tue 11/21 2:53 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to Janssen Research & Development LLC filed by All Plaintiffs re1 Complaint,. (Roman, Jose) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Fri 03/31 2:18 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson Company.(Dellucci, kristen) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
7 | 7
service
Request for Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 9:44 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs re1 Complaint,. (Roman, Jose) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 9:43 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson Company filed by All Plaintiffs re1 Complaint,. (Roman, Jose) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 03/22 9:32 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint: **Clerk was not able to issue summons to Johnson & Johnson Company Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. These are two separate parties, and one summons should be completed for each named defendant. When refiling, please file the summons requests into this same case using the event Request for Summons Issued.** (jls) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 9:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC. (jls) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 03/21 12:00 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Application for Refund of Electronic Fees
Tue 03/21 11:30 AM
Application for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by Joseph Mancino for the following reason: paid twice; receipt number 053L-6028945. (Roman, Jose) |
|
misc
Filing Fee Payment - Case Opening - 400 dollars
Tue 03/21 10:32 AM
Filing fee paid from All Plaintiffs re1 Complaint, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6036127) (Roman, Jose) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Fee previously paid) filed by Joseph Mancino.Attorney Jose Diego Roman added to party Joseph Mancino(pty:pla).(Roman, Jose) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons |