Capleton v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02278 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:48 AM CDT |
Defendant
Aventis Pharma S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Capleton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 05/21 4:08 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 04/11 3:22 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 12:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(tm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 10:36 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, separately, and doing business as Winthrop U.S. filed by Pamela Capleton re1 Complaint,.(Hodges, David) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 03/20 9:51 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 4:27 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6031982) filed by Pamela Capleton.Attorney David Wayne Hodges added to party Pamela Capleton(pty:pla).(Hodges, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |