David et al v. Outback Steakhouse of Florida, L.L.C. et al
Louisiana Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John W Degravelles |
Referred: | Erin Wilder-Doomes |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00157 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:31 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bloomin' Brands, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Outback Steakhouse of Florida, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
XYZ Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Andy David
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol David
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
60 Day Order of Dismissal
Thu 02/01 8:55 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 02/01/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 01/31 2:23 PM
Settlement Conference Report and Recommendation/Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Settlement Conference held on 1/30/2018. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that a 60-day conditional order of dismissal be entered. (KAH) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice to Counsel
Mon 01/29 4:37 PM
Notice to Counsel: In light of communication to the court, the defendants' representative(s) is allowed to attend via phone as necessary. Defendants' representative(s) shall be available by phone at all times, subject to sanctions if not. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Mon 01/29 12:19 PM
Letter dated 1/26/2018 from Matthew C. Nodier to Magistrate Judge Wilder-Doomes Re: no objection from plaintiffs to waiving appearance of representative. (BLR) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Remand Order on Motion to Withdraw
Mon 01/29 8:47 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Withdraw10 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/29/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 01/26 3:24 PM
Minute Entry/Scheduling Conference Report for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Telephone Conference held on 1/26/2018. Counsel for plaintiffs agreed to file a Motion to Withdraw the Motion to Remand by no later than 1/29/2018, subject to the right to reurge the Motion to Remand if the case is not resolved at the settlement conference. The position paper must be submitted and a settlement demand and offer exchanged by no later than 1/29/2018. (SGO) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Withdraw
Fri 01/26 11:48 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs.(Possa, Stephanie) Modified to edit text on 1/26/2018 (SGO) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Order | ||
utility
Motion(s) Referred
Fri 01/26 3:31 PM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:17 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Remand. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO) |
||
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Telephone Conference (EWD)
Wed 01/24 11:03 AM
NOTICE of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference set for 1/26/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes to discuss settlement conference and10 Motion to Remand. Counsel participating in the Conference shall call 877-336-1839 using access code 9565780 five minutes prior to conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
support
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 12/20 4:13 PM
REPLY to12 Opposition to10 MOTION to Remand filed by Andy David, Carol David.(LLH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 12/20 2:18 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief Memorandum in Opposition to MOTION to Remand. The clerk's office is directed to file R. Docs. 13-2 through 13-7 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/20/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 12/20 12:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by All Plaintiffs.(Possa, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Order re Motion for Leave, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading;, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E | ||
utility
Motion(s) Referred
Wed 12/20 1:13 PM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:13 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) |
||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 11/29 10:24 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to10 MOTION to Remand filed by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Outback Steakhouse of Florida, L.L.C..(Nodier, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
utility
Motion(s) Referred
Thu 11/16 1:57 PM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:10 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) |
||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
7
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 11/15 2:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs.(Possa, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
10 | 10
motion
Remand
Wed 11/15 12:50 PM
MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs.(Possa, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Order, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment Stipulation | ||
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Briefing Schedule - Response to Motion Deadlines (JWD)
Fri 10/27 7:59 AM
NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on8 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 10/26 11:29 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Outback Steakhouse of Florida, L.L.C..(Nodier, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading;, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Attachment Statement of Uncontested Material Facts | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Settlement Conference Order
Thu 05/25 11:14 AM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 1/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/24/2017. (EDC) |
|
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 05/25 11:09 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2017. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 11/30/2017. Discovery due by 11/30/2017. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 3/30/2018. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 4/15/2018. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 5/15/2018. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 5/30/2018. Discovery from Experts due by 6/30/2018. Motions shall be filed by 8/1/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/21/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 12/19/2018. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 1/2/2019. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 1/30/2019. Jury Trial set for 3/11/2019 - 3/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/24/2017. (EDC) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel
Tue 05/16 10:31 AM
Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2017 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Status Report
Thu 05/04 3:32 PM
STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Possa, Stephanie) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/05 3:28 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Outback Steakhouse of Florida, L.L.C..(Nodier, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
90 Day Conference Order
Tue 04/04 2:38 PM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2017 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/4/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/04/2017. (ELW) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (Complete Case Opening First)
Fri 03/17 3:00 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 655169. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1541596), filed by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Outback Steakhouse of Florida, L.L.C..(Nodier, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |