Moore v. SHULKIN
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Dee D Drell |
Referred: | Joseph H L Perez-Montes |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00411 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 05:7703 Discrimination - Review of Agency Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
David J Shulkin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Moore
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Minute Entry
Thu 07/05 11:31 AM
MINUTE ENTRY: The pretrial conference scheduled in this matter for 2/21/18 is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 7/3/18. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Thu 07/05 11:30 AM
ORDER granting19 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 7/3/18. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Mon 07/02 10:24 AM
VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Debra Moore.(aty,Jones, Jennings) Modified on 7/2/2018 to modify docket text. (Crick, S) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Minute Entry ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 06/27 1:57 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Telephone Conference is set for 8/10/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate a conference call to include all counsel of record and all pro se parties, and shall then call the chambers of Magistrate Judge Perez-Montes at (318) 473-7510. Only attorneys enrolled as counsel of record may participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/27/18. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 06/05 5:09 PM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 5/11/2018. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minute Entry ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 04/17 9:58 AM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Telephone Status Conference is set for 5/11/2018 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate a conference call to include all counsel of record and all pro se parties, and shall then call the chambers of Magistrate Judge Perez-Montes at (318) 473-7510. Only attorneys enrolled as counsel of record may participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/17/2018. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Case Management Order - Judge Drell
Wed 11/29 10:19 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO 2 - for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/28/2017. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
14 | 14
order
Plan of Work
Wed 11/29 10:18 AM
PLAN OF WORK filed by All Parties. Discovery deadline 6/5/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 9/5/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 1/5/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 2/5/2018. Final Date for Expert Employment 8/6/2018. Exchange of Expert Reports due by 10/5/2018. Expert Depositions due by 11/5/2018. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 12/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/28/2017. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Proposed Plan of Work
Wed 11/29 10:15 AM
ORDER granting10 Proposed Plan of Work. Pretrial Conference is set for 2/21/2019 at 9:30 AM, in Chambers, before Judge Dee D Drell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/28/2017. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
12 | 12
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 11/29 10:13 AM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/28/2017. (Court Reporter: LCR, Alexandria - 3rd Floor) (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minute Entry ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 11/22 10:58 AM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Status Conference is set for 11/28/2017 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Each party is to call our AT&T conference number at 877-336-1829. When you are prompted for an access code, enter 2670431. You will be placed on hold and will not hear anything except silence. However, the Clerk will join the call shortly thereafter. Only counsel of record may participate in the conference. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the proposed Plan of Work, pretrial procedures, anticipated discovery issues, dispositive motions, and settlement prospects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/22/2017. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Proposed Plan of Work
Thu 11/02 11:35 AM
PROPOSED Plan of Work by Debra Moore, David J Shulkin. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes.(aty,Jones, Jennings) Modified on 11/2/2017 to add filer and modify docket text. (Crick, S) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension (Other)
Wed 10/11 11:14 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Plan of Work. Proposed Plan of Work deadline set for 11/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 10/10/2017. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension (Other)
Fri 10/06 11:27 AM
MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to File Plan of Work with consent by Debra Moore. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes.(aty,Jones, Jennings) Modified on 10/6/2017 to modify docket text. (Crick, S) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 08/22 11:41 PM
ANSWER to 2 Amended Complaint by David J Shulkin.(aty,Williams-Auzenne, Desiree) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 06/21 8:22 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 2 Amended Complaint David J Shulkin answer due 8/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/21/2017. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 06/19 3:13 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint with consent by David J Shulkin. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes.(Attorney Desiree C Williams-Auzenne added to party David J Shulkin(pty:dft))(aty,Williams-Auzenne, Desiree) Modified on 6/19/2017 to create docket entry relationship. (Crick, S) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Case Management Order - Judge Drell ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 03/22 9:31 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 5/16/2017.) (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued - USA (Form Included)
Tue 03/21 4:15 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, David J Shulkin in his official capacity as Secretary of Veterans Affairs (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/20 10:48 AM
COMPLAINT by Debra Moore against David J Shulkin. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as this document was electronically filed as 2 Amended Complaint. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 3/21/2017 to add document number. (Crick, S) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/21 4:11 PM
CASE Assigned to Chief Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Crick, S) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 10:50 AM
COMPLAINT against DAVID J SHULKIN (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3317581) filed by Debra Moore.(Attorney Jennings Bryan Jones, III added to party Debra Moore(pty:pla))(aty,Jones, Jennings) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet |