Sonnier et al v. Varsity Spirit L L C
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert G James |
Referred: | Patrick J Hanna |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00416 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:26 AM CDT |
Defendant
Varsity Spirit L L C
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Sonnier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Sonnier
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Tue 12/05 5:09 PM
JUDGMENT granting15 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant are Dismissed With Prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/5/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Mon 12/04 10:39 AM
VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Angela Sonnier, James Sonnier.(aty,Galloway, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension (Other)
Wed 09/06 4:13 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 12/6/2017. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 11/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/6/2017. (crt,Alexander, E) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension (Other)
Tue 09/05 3:08 PM
Joint MOTION FOR EXTENSION of to Modify Scheduling Order by James Sonnier, Angela Sonnier, Varsity Spirit L L C. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna.(aty,Galloway, Thomas) Modified on 9/5/2017 to add filers (FinnSld, P) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 06/21 4:43 PM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/21/2017. Following discussion, it was decided that the jury trial of this matter will begin on 4/9/2018 before Judge James. It was also decided that the pretrial conference will be held before Judge Hanna at 11:00 a.m. on 3/5/2018. The parties will be notified whether the pretrial conference will be held in person or by phone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/21/2017. (crt,Alexander, E) |
|
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order - Hanna/Whitehurst
Wed 06/21 2:47 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/9/2018 at 9:30 AM in Lafayette Court House before Judge Robert G James. Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2018 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 7/11/2017. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 7/17/2017. Rule 26 Report due by 8/8/2017. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 9/6/2017. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 9/6/2017. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 10/6/2017. Discovery deadline 11/6/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 12/5/2017. Daubert Motions due by 12/5/2017. Motions in Limine due by 2/5/2018. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 2/5/2018. Pretrial Order due by 2/20/2018. Bench Books due by 2/20/2018. Trial Depositions due by 2/20/2018. Real Time glossary due by 2/26/2018. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 2/26/2018. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 6/21/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order - Hanna/Whitehurst
Wed 06/21 1:59 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/9/2018 at 9:30 AM at Lafayette Court House before Judge Robert G James. Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2018 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 7/11/2017. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 7/17/2017. Rule 26 Report due by 8/8/2017. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 9/6/2017. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 9/6/2017. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 10/6/2017. Discovery deadline 11/6/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 12/5/2017. Daubert Motions due by 12/5/2017. Motions in Limine due by 2/5/2018. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 2/5/2018. Pretrial Order due by 2/20/2018. Bench Books due by 2/20/2018. Trial Depositions due by 2/20/2018. Real Time glossary due by 2/26/2018. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 2/26/2018. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 6/21/2017. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Setting Scheduling Conference
Tue 06/06 12:37 PM
ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 6/20/2017 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Counsel shall call in to the conference by dialing 888-684-8852 and using access code 5910394. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/6/2017. (crt,Alexander, E) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Jurisdictional Review Finding
Wed 04/19 11:11 AM
JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING. The undersigned finds that the parties are diverse and that the amount in controversy exceeds the jurisdictional minimum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/19/2017. (crt,Alexander, E) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Response to Removal Order
Tue 03/28 12:40 PM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Varsity Spirit L L C . (aty,Gremillion, Druit) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Removal Order
Fri 03/24 9:02 AM
REMOVAL ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/23/2017. (crt,Alexander, E) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/21 5:14 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Varsity Spirit L L C identifying Other Affiliate Varsity Brands, LLC, Other Affiliate Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc., Other Affiliate Hercules VB Holdings, Inc. for Varsity Spirit L L C. (aty,Gremillion, Druit) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/21 5:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Varsity Spirit L L C.(aty,Gremillion, Druit) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 03/20 1:46 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Mon 03/20 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Druit George Gremillion, Jr, Douglas Kent Williams on behalf of Varsity Spirit L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/3/2017. (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/17 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 27th JDC St. Landry Parish, Case Number C-170550C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3318305) filed by Varsity Spirit, L.L.C..(Attorney Druit George Gremillion, Jr added to party Varsity Spirit, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(aty,Gremillion, Druit) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 4 Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Notice to Adverse Party, | ||
Att: 6 State court notice of filing | ||
service
State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)
Mon 03/20 1:15 PM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Varsity Spirit L L C answer due 3/24/2017. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #4 OF DOCUMENT1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/20 1:18 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert G James and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M) |