Ayele v. Foreman et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Nanette K Laughrey |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-04049 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:30 AM CDT |
Defendant
Willie Maxwell
|
|
Defendant
Thomas Wulff
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Wilson
|
|
Defendant
Jeff Voss
|
|
Defendant
Sylvia Smith
|
|
Defendant
Forrest Smith
|
|
Defendant
Tracy Smalls
|
|
Defendant
Joe Schramm
|
|
Defendant
Cassandra Sailer
|
|
Defendant
Brittany Reichel
|
|
Defendant
Risa Perkins
|
|
Defendant
Sean Oliviera
|
|
Defendant
Jerome Morgan
|
|
Defendant
Douglas McGrath
|
|
Defendant
Cherryl Maddox
|
|
Defendant
Ryan Lacey
|
|
Defendant
Brian Kasner
|
|
Defendant
Lori Hollinger
|
|
Defendant
Naomi Harper
|
|
Defendant
Lynn Geeson
|
|
Defendant
Marty Martin Foreman
|
|
Defendant
John Fisher
|
|
Defendant
Roya Ferozi
|
|
Defendant
Lee Baldwin
|
|
Defendant
Frishta Aslami
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Ayele
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Mon 07/24 11:05 AM
ORDER. The Court previously denied Plaintiff Ayele's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) without prejudice, Doc.2 , and Plaintiff has now filed a second motion to reconsider, Doc.5 . The motion to reconsider, Doc.5 , is granted in part. The Court denied Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed IFP because Plaintiff failed to demonstrate that he is sufficiently impoverished to qualify to proceed under 28 USC sec. 1915(a), the first step of the analysis for such a request. The Court stated that Plaintiff's IFP affidavit appeared incomplete at best, in that Plaintiff stated he had no income of any kind including gifts or public assistance, had no assets, and was looking for a job, yet also had no debt and had been able to travel extensively over a period of years, suggesting he has financial resources notwithstanding his lack of employment. See Doc.2 . Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this Order, or until 8/23/2017, in which to file an affidavit providing detailed information about his income, assets, expenses, employment, and any other information explaining why he cannot pay the costs of the proceedings. The motion to reconsider is denied in all other respects. A copy of this Order was mailed to Plaintiff. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Barragan-Scott, Alana) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Reconsideration
Fri 06/30 3:48 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Michael Ayele. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/14/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Mon 06/12 10:42 AM
ORDER. Plaintiff Ayele moves for reconsideration or clarification, Doc.3 , of the Court's Order of 4/26/2017, Doc.2 , denying his request to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff also requests appointment of counsel. The motion is denied. Plaintiff is not entitled to proceed in forma pauperis for the reasons stated in the Order of 4/26/2017. Further, there is no constitutional or statutory right to appointment of counsel in a civil case. Whether counsel should be appointed is a decision left to the broad discretion of the Court. Davis v. Scott, 94 F.3d 444, 447 (8th Cir. 1996). Under the circumstances presented here, the Court in its discretion denies Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel. A copy of this Order was mailed to Plaintiff. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Barragan-Scott, Alana) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Reconsideration
Wed 05/31 9:58 AM
PRO SE MOTION for reconsideration re2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,filed by Michael Ayele. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/13/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Travis, Kendra) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/26 1:16 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff Michael Ayele's application to proceed without prepayment of fees and costs, or in forma pauperis, Doc. 1, is denied without prejudice. Signed on 4/26/17 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Order mailed to Plaintiff.) (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/17 1:46 PM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/ Financial Affidavit filed by Michael Ayele. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/31/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Ellis, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 |