Kirk v. Rescare Inc
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen Gren Scholer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00769 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
Rescare Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adam Kirk
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation
Wed 05/02 12:05 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Rescare Inc. (Holiday, Dawn) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Public Entry)
Wed 05/02 1:59 PM
Civil Case Terminated per23 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. (ndt) |
||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Mon 04/09 2:43 PM
ORDER ON CLOSING DOCUMENTS: On or before 5/4/2018, all parties shall file with the Court all papers necessary for the closing of this case and its removal from the active docket of this Court. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/9/2018) (sss) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Mon 03/26 11:58 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF STATUS CONFERENCE: In light of the parties Notice of Settlement, the status conference set 3/29/2018 has been cancelled. (chmb) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/23 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Adam Kirk (Goodman, Robert) |
|
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Fri 03/23 11:26 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AFTER CASE TRANSFER: Status Conference set for 3/29/2018 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/23/2018) (axm) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
6
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/12 8:38 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings per Special Order 3-318. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/8/2018) (chmb) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Protective Order
Fri 03/02 4:39 PM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/2/2018) (axm) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
adr
ADR Summary
Thu 03/01 2:48 PM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by Will Pryor. Attorneys in Attendance: Robert Goodman, Dawn Holiday. Prv Fee: $ 3900. Outcome of ADR: Parties were unable to reach a settlement. (Pryor, Will) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Protective Order
Fri 02/23 4:22 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Rescare Inc (Holiday, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order | ||
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 01/16 3:59 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting12 Motion to Continue: Discovery due by 7/27/2018. Motions due by 7/27/2018. Trial reset for Court's one-week docket beginning 9/17/2018 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/16/2018) (sss) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 01/16 3:31 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot11 Motion to Continue per12 Amended Motion to Continue. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/16/2018) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Continue
Thu 01/04 11:04 AM
Amended MOTION to Continue filed by Adam Kirk (Goodman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Amendment | ||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Continue
Fri 12/15 2:58 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Rescare Inc (Holiday, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 06/30 3:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on 3/12/2018 before Judge David C Godbey. The setting is for a one week docket. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/30/2017. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/30/2017) (twd) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Status Report
Tue 06/27 9:03 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Adam Kirk. (Goodman, Robert) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Thu 04/20 11:01 AM
ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/20/2017) (sss) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/19 10:52 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rescare Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Res-Care, Inc. for Rescare Inc. (Holiday, Dawn) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 04/19 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dawn Shree Holiday on behalf of Rescare Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Holiday, Dawn) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/19 10:46 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Rescare Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Dawn Shree Holiday added to party Rescare Inc(pty:dft) (Holiday, Dawn) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 11:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Rescare Inc. (svc) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
qcref
Godbey
Fri 03/17 11:24 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/17 9:04 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Adam Kirk. (Goodman, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
3
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 9:02 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against RESCARE INC DBA RESCARE WORKFORCE SERVICES filed by Adam Kirk. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8282453) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Goodman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |