LearningMate Solutions Inc. v. 360training.com, Inc.
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Lee Yeakel |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00246 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:35 AM CDT |
Defendant
360training.com, Inc.
13801 N. MoPac Expwy Suite 100
Austin, TX 78727 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LearningMate Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
order
Judgment
Thu 12/28 4:24 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) |
|
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 12/28 4:23 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 12/22 10:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LearningMate Solutions Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Fed.R.Civ.P.(Leach, Sid) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 11/22 11:56 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2018 at 11:00 AM and Jury Trial in the month of June 2018 before Judge Lee Yeakel, Discovery due by 4/1/2018,. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) |
|
34 | 34
minutes
Pretrial Conference
Wed 11/22 9:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/21/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(dm) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Notice
Tue 11/21 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests by LearningMate Solutions Inc. (Leach, Sid) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
adr
ADR Report Filed - Consent to Alternate Dispute Resolution
Mon 11/20 2:19 PM
ADR Report Filed - CONSENT to Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) by 360training.com, Inc.(Morin, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 10/31 7:51 PM
1st Supplemental ANSWER to1 Complaint by 360training.com, Inc..(Morin, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 10/24 3:09 PM
ORDER, ( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2017 at 03:30 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel,). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice
Fri 10/20 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LearningMate Solutions Inc. (Leach, Sid) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Filing
Thu 10/19 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Filing Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) by LearningMate Solutions Inc. (Leach, Sid) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Amend/Correct (Not Judgment)
Fri 10/13 2:06 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by LearningMate Solutions Inc..(Leach, Sid) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice
Thu 10/12 10:36 AM
NOTICE NON-CONSENT to Trial by Magistrate Judge by LearningMate Solutions Inc. (Leach, Sid) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 10/12 8:03 AM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by 360training.com, Inc.. (Morin, Paul) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Mon 10/09 11:21 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by LearningMate Solutions Inc.. (Leach, Sid) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Wed 08/09 10:59 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 360training.com, Inc.. (Morin, Paul) |
|
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/09 10:51 PM
Defendant's Original ANSWER to1 Complaint by 360training.com, Inc..(Morin, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion to Set Aside
Wed 07/26 3:09 PM
ORDER DENYING13 Motion for Default Judgment; GRANTING15 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default. FURTHER ORDERED that Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant 36Otraining.com, Inc. (Clerk's Doc. No.12 ) is SET ASIDE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Wed 07/26 3:10 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: 360training.com, Inc. answer due 8/9/2017. (td) |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 06/28 4:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by 360training.com, Inc., re15 MOTION to Set Aside12 Clerk's Entry of Default,13 MOTION for Default Judgment against 360training.com, Inc. (Hearing requested) filed by Defendant 360training.com, Inc. (Morin, Paul) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Attachment
Thu 06/22 12:01 AM
ATTACHMENT (proposed order) to18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by LearningMate Solutions Inc.. (Leach, Sid) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 06/21 11:59 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by LearningMate Solutions Inc., re15 MOTION to Set Aside12 Clerk's Entry of Default,13 MOTION for Default Judgment against 360training.com, Inc. (Hearing requested) filed by Defendant 360training.com, Inc.(Leach, Sid) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Index of exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit P-9, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit P-10, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit P-11, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit P-12, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit P-13, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit P-14, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit P-15, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit P-16, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit P-17, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit P-18, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit P-19, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit P-20 | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Attachment
Thu 06/15 11:41 AM
ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to15 MOTION to Set Aside12 Clerk's Entry of Default,13 MOTION for Default Judgment against 360training.com, Inc. (Hearing requested) by 360training.com, Inc.. (Morin, Paul) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Deficiency Notice
Thu 06/15 8:19 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 15 MOTION to Set Aside 12 Clerk's Entry of Default, 13 MOTION for Default Judgment against 360training.com, Inc. (Hearing requested) (dm) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Set Aside
Wed 06/14 8:57 PM
MOTION to Set Aside12 Clerk's Entry of Default,13 MOTION for Default Judgment against 360training.com, Inc. (Hearing requested) by 360training.com, Inc.. (Morin, Paul) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice
Mon 05/22 5:29 PM
NOTICE of service of copy of motion for default judgment upon Defendant by LearningMate Solutions Inc. re13 MOTION for Default Judgment against 360training.com, Inc.(Leach, Sid) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - affidavit of service | ||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 05/16 11:32 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against 360training.com, Inc. by LearningMate Solutions Inc..(Leach, Sid) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Exhibit List, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit P-1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit P-2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit P-3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit P-4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit P-5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit P-6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit P-7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit P-8, | ||
Att: 10 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 04/25 11:50 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 360training.com, Inc. (dm) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Entry of Default
Tue 04/25 2:33 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default against 360training.com, Inc. by LearningMate Solutions Inc..(Leach, Sid) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Sid Leach | ||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/18 2:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sid Leach. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice
Thu 04/13 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Intention to Amend Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by LearningMate Solutions Inc. (dm) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/17 1:35 PM
AMENDED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sidney Minturn Leach on behalf of LearningMate Solutions Inc.. (dm) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/10 9:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by LearningMate Solutions Inc., 360training.com, Inc. served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. (td) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/30 4:11 PM
ORDER DENYING3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sid Leach. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 4:24 PM
Summons Issued as to 360training.com, Inc.. (afd) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Fri 03/17 9:38 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LearningMate Soultions Inc.. (Leach, Sidney) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/17 9:28 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sidney Minturn Leach ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9406006) by on behalf of LearningMate Soultions Inc.. (Leach, Sidney) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 03/17 9:11 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LearningMate Soultions Inc.. (Leach, Sidney) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 9:09 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9406001), filed by LearningMate Soultions Inc..(Leach, Sidney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/20 3:08 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) |