Cobb Mechanical Contractors, Inc. v. AMG-S&P, A Joint Venture, LLC et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Pitman |
Referred: | Jeffrey C Manske |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00073 |
Nature of Suit | 130 Contract - Miller Act |
Cause | 28:1352 Miller Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:43 AM CDT |
Defendant
AMG-S&P, A Joint Venture, LLC
723 Jackson #101
San Antonio, TX 78212 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Continental Casualty Company
|
|
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Cobb Mehanical Contractors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 05/30 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by AMG-S&P, A Joint Venture, LLC (Hoelscher, Jon) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/20 10:52 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cobb Mehanical Contractors, Inc. as to Continental Casualty Company. Waiver sent on 4/7/2017, answer due 6/6/2017. (Rosendahl, Patricia) |
|
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/20 10:49 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cobb Mehanical Contractors, Inc. as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Waiver sent on 4/7/2017, answer due 6/6/2017. (Rosendahl, Patricia) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/20 10:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cobb Mehanical Contractors, Inc. as to AMG-S&P, A Joint Venture, LLC. Waiver sent on 3/31/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. (Rosendahl, Patricia) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Reissued
Tue 04/04 2:50 PM
Summons Reissued as to Continental Casualty Company and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (jgb) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/04 1:38 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cobb Mehanical Contractors, Inc.. (Rosendahl, Patricia) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/31 1:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Continental Casualty Company and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (jgb) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 03/31 1:13 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cobb Mehanical Contractors, Inc.. 2 summons requested (Rosendahl, Patricia) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
9
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/17 3:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cobb Mechanical Contractors, LLC amending1 Complaint., filed by Cobb Mechanical Contractors, LLC.(Rosendahl, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 2:32 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9404654), filed by Cobb Mechanical Contractors, LLC.(Rosendahl, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/17 2:56 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (tb) |
||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/17 2:57 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb) |