North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund et al v. Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc. et al
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | James D Peterson |
Referred: | Stephen L Crocker |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00215 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A. - Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:41 AM CDT |
Defendant
Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc.
5116 Jean Duluth Road
Duluth, MN 55803 |
|
Plaintiff
Contract Administration Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Shea
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
David Sundberg
Terminated: 07/06/2017
5116 Jean Duluth Road
Duluth, MN 55803 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
order
Judgment - Default
Thu 07/06 9:53 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea against Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc. in the amount of $ 122,403.65. (jat) |
|
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thu 07/06 9:15 AM
ORDER granting34 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/5/17. (jat) |
|
39 | 39
order
Text Only Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 07/06 8:29 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** As the court indicated at the June 20, 2017 default hearing, plaintiffs have not made a prima facie showing of the court's personal jurisdiction over defendant Sundberg, who appears to be a Minnesota citizen. The court has received plaintiffs' amended submissions, and the court is prepared to enter judgment against the corporate defendant. But because there has been no showing that the court has jurisdiction over Sundberg, the court will dismiss plaintiffs' claims against him, without prejudice, for lack of personal jurisdiction. The court will enter default judgment against Lipe Brothers Construction in a separate order. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/6/17. (jat) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Affidavit
Tue 06/20 3:28 PM
Second Affidavit of Philip E. Thompson filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea as to Defendant, Lipe Brothers Construction re:34 Motion to Amend/Correct,, (Thompson, Philip) |
|
37 | 37
respm
Affidavit
Tue 06/20 3:27 PM
Second Affidavit of Philip E. Thompson filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea as to Defendant, David Sundberg re:33 Motion to Amend/Correct,,, (Thompson, Philip) |
|
36 | 36
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 06/20 2:33 PM
Disregard. Modified on 6/20/2017. (lak) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 06/20 2:31 PM
Disregard. Modified on 6/20/2017. (lak) |
|
34 | 34
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 06/20 2:16 PM
Second Motion to Amend/Correct by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea. Response due 6/27/2017. (Thompson, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
33 | 33
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 06/20 2:14 PM
Second Motion to Amend/Correct25 Amended Motion for Default Judgment as to David Sundberg by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea. Response due 6/27/2017. (Thompson, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
minutes
Telephone Motion Hearing (Chambers Only)
Tue 06/20 8:19 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge James D. Peterson: Telephone Motion Hearing held on 6/20/2017 re25 Amended Motion for Default Judgment as to David Sundberg filed by Jerry Shea, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, Contract Administration Fund,24 Amended Motion for Default Judgment as to Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc. filed by Jerry Shea, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund [:10] (skv) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Appear by Telephone
Mon 06/19 10:56 AM
Notice from Counsel re: Contact Telephone Number for Default Hearing by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea. (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 6/19/2017. (lak) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Default Hearing
Fri 06/16 9:29 AM
Reset Hearing to accommodate the court's calendar: Default Hearing set for 6/20/2017 is reset for 08:00 AM in Courtroom 260 before District Judge James D. Peterson. (jat) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Default Hearing
Fri 06/16 10:21 AM
Reset Hearing: Default Hearing set for 6/20/2017 will be held at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 360 before District Judge James D. Peterson. (jat) |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 05/30 9:41 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant David Sundberg. (jat) |
|
30 | 30
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 05/30 9:40 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc. (jat) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Default Hearing
Tue 05/30 9:48 AM
Set Hearing: Default Hearing set for 6/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 260 before District Judge James D. Peterson. (jat) |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/24 10:30 AM
Amended Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea as to25 Amended Motion for Default Judgment as to David Sundberg,27 Affidavit. (Thompson, Philip) |
|
28 | 28
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/24 10:29 AM
Amended Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea as to26 Affidavit,24 Amended Motion for Default Judgment as to Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc. (Thompson, Philip) |
|
27 | 27
respm
Affidavit
Wed 05/24 10:22 AM
Amended Affidavit of Philip E. Thompson filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea re:25 Motion for Default Judgment (Thompson, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Audit - 1/1/14-10/31/16, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Audit - 4/1/15-9/30/16, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Payroll Audit Invoice - 10/16-02/17, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Statement of Attorney Costs | ||
26 | 26
respm
Affidavit
Wed 05/24 10:18 AM
Amended Affidavit of Philip E. Thompson filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea re:24 Motion for Default Judgment (Thompson, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Audit - 1/1/14-10/31/16, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Audit - 4/1/15-9/30/16, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Payroll Audit Invoice - 10/16-02/17, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Statement of Attorney Costs, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Statement of Attorneys Fees | ||
25 | 25
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 05/24 10:13 AM
Amended Motion for Default Judgment as to David Sundberg, filed by All Plaintiffs, (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 5/24/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Text of Proposed Order | ||
24 | 24
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 05/24 10:12 AM
Amended Motion for Default Judgment as to Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc., filed by All Plaintiffs, (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 5/24/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 05/23 10:22 AM
Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea as to20 Motion for Default Judgment as to David Sundberg. (Thompson, Philip) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Affidavit
Tue 05/23 10:21 AM
Affidavit of Philip E. Thompson filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea re:20 Motion for Default Judgment (Thompson, Philip) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Affidavit
Tue 05/23 10:20 AM
Affidavit of Philip E. Thompson filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea re:20 Motion for Default Judgment (Thompson, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Audit - 1/1/14-10/31/16, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Audit - 4/1/15-9/30/16, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Statement of Attorneys Costs - 5/22/17 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 05/23 10:16 AM
Motion for Default Judgment as to David Sundberg by All Plaintiffs, (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order and Entry of Judgment | ||
19 | 19
respm
Affidavit
Tue 05/23 10:13 AM
Affidavit of Philip E. Thompson filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea re:18 Motion for Entry of Default (Thompson, Philip) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Entry of Default
Tue 05/23 10:11 AM
Corrected Motion for Entry of Default as to David Sundberg by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
motion
Entry of Default
Tue 05/23 10:10 AM
Corrected Motion for Entry of Default as to Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc., by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
respm
Affidavit
Tue 05/23 10:04 AM
Affidavit of Philip E. Thompson filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea re:20 Motion for Default Judgment. (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 05/23 10:02 AM
Disregard. See18 . Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 05/23 9:56 AM
Corrected Motion for Default Judgment as to Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc., by All Plaintiffs, (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order and Entry of Judgment | ||
13 | 13
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 05/23 9:49 AM
Disregard. See17 . Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak) |
|
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 05/23 8:50 AM
Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea as to10 Motion for Entry of Default as to Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc.,11 Affidavit,8 Affidavit,9 Affidavit,7 Motion for Entry of Default as to Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc. (Thompson, Philip) |
|
11 | 11
respm
Affidavit
Tue 05/23 8:48 AM
Affidavit of Philip E. Thompson filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea re:14 Motion for Entry of Default, (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Audit - 1/1/14-10/31/16, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Audit - 4/1/15-9/30/16, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Statement of Attorneys Costs - 5/22/17, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Statement of Attorneys Costs - 5/22/17 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Entry of Default
Tue 05/23 8:45 AM
Text of Proposed Entry of Default as to Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak) |
|
9 | 9
respm
Affidavit
Tue 05/23 8:42 AM
Affidavit of Philip E. Thompson filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea re:17 Motion for Entry of Default. (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Affidavit
Tue 05/23 8:41 AM
Affidavit of Philip E. Thompson filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea re:14 Motion for Entry of Default. (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Entry of Default
Tue 05/23 8:38 AM
Disregard. Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 04/25 8:26 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiffs' counsel requests a 30-day extension to move for default, stating that the parties are in the process of "working on a stipulation to the judgment." Dkt.5 . The request is granted. But if the court does not receive the promised stipulation or a motion for default by May 24, 2017, it will dismiss the suit without prejudice for plaintiffs' failure to prosecute it. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/25/17. (jat) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 04/20 1:02 PM
Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Jerry Shea. (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 4/20/2017. (lak) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 03/29 3:23 PM
Summons Returned Executed. David Sundberg served on 3/27/2017, answer due 4/17/2017. (Thompson, Philip) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 03/29 3:22 PM
Summons Returned Executed. Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc. served on 3/27/2017, answer due 4/17/2017. (Thompson, Philip) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 8:50 AM
Summons Issued as to Lipe Brothers Construction, Inc., David Sundberg. (jat) |
|
utility
Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
Mon 03/20 8:47 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat) |
||
utility
Standard Attachments Sent
Mon 03/20 8:47 AM
Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (jat) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 4:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-1991766.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Thompson, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet |