Jacobs v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00807 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:17 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angenette Jacobs
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
orderM
Order Amending Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Tue 03/31 3:26 PM
Remark - Case transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) |
||
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
30+
pgs
orderM
Order Amending Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Mon 03/23 11:17 AM
AMENDED ORDER - SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B]. (SLQ) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
30+
pgs
orderM
Order Amending Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Thu 03/19 12:43 PM
AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
30+
pgs
orderM
Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Mon 03/16 2:45 PM
ORDER - SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (SLQ) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 03/17 8:44 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-807-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 8:43 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14021888 filed by Angenette Jacobs.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |