Lewis v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00813 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:27 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 04/26 11:22 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation of dismissal with prejudice as to Plaintiff Donald Lewis (Doc.25 ) is granted. This matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/2021. (LAD) |
|
Friday, April 23, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 04/23 7:48 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Donald Lewis's Claims with Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Lerner, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 17, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 03/17 2:10 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' joint motion for extension (Doc.23 ) is granted. All deadlines are stayed until April 23, 2021. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/17/2021. (LAD) |
|
Wednesday, March 10, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 03/10 12:28 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Motion to Temporarily Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Donald Lewis.(Stackhouse, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 12/07 11:36 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Stay. All deadlines are hereby stayed until March 23, 2021 to allow the parties to finalize the settlement of this matter. The Court will not grant further extension of this deadline absent truly extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/7/2020. (CLB) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Stay
Mon 11/23 1:39 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Lerner, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 30, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Fri 10/30 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lerner, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 10/29 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Donald Lewis. (Stackhouse, Andrea) |
|
Friday, October 02, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 10/02 10:09 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion Stipulated Motion Regarding Remote Appearances at the Settlement Conference. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties may conduct their mediation and/or good-faith settlement conference telephonically or over Zoom (or similar) videoconferencing platform. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/30/20. (MAP) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 09/23 2:15 PM
MOTION Remote Appearances at the Settlement Conference re:16 Scheduling Order Stipulated Motion Regarding Remote Appearances at the Settlement Conference by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Gallardo, Kristine) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 08/07 2:06 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. - Discovery due by 12/18/2021. Status Report due by 11/5/2021. Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2021 at 02:00 PM before Senior Judge David G Campbell. See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/6/20. (MAP) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 08/06 1:03 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge David G Campbell: Scheduling Conference held on 8/5/2020. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 3:30 PM to 4:14 PM.(CLB) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Fri 07/31 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James R Condo on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Condo, James) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
8
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 07/29 12:08 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2020 at 03:30 PM before Senior Judge David G Campbell. The conference will be held telephonically and will be scheduled for one hour. Defense counsel shall arrange for a dial-in number and shall email the dial-in information to counsel for all parties and the Court no later than 12:00 p.m. on August 3, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 7/29/20. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)
Thu 07/23 2:32 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Lerner, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E | ||
Monday, June 29, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Tue 06/30 8:08 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:10 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Donald Lewis. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Please note for future filings. No further action is required. It is not necessary to refile . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Mon 06/29 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Stephen O'Connor on behalf of Donald Lewis. (O'Connor, Mark) |
|
9 | 9
9
pgs
order
Order
Mon 06/29 11:48 AM
ORDER Setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference. Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will require the parties to submit proposed case management schedules for the remainder of these cases. The parties shall jointly file the Case Management Report with the Clerk by July 23, 2020. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 6/26/20. (MAP) |
|
Monday, May 04, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Mon 05/04 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R Nash on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Nash, Mark) |
|
Thursday, April 09, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Thu 04/09 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B Lerner on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lerner, Matthew) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
112
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/09 8:28 AM
AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
112
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/09 7:38 AM
*AENDED By Doc.6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) *Modified on 3/9/2020 (MAP) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 1:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 03/17 1:03 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Donald Lewis.(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 03/17 12:17 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-813-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 12:16 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14028009 filed by Donald Lewis.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |