Hornsby v. Shartle
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | James A Soto |
Referred: | Leslie A Bowman |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00123 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 08/07 11:00 AM
ORDER of USCA re:6 Notice of Appeal filed by Arnold Darnell Hornsby. The request for a certificate of appealability (Docket Entry No. 3 ) is denied. Any pending motions are denied as moot. DENIED. TERMINATED. (See attached PDF for complete information).(BAC) |
|
Att: 1 NDA | ||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 06/08 10:40 AM
USCA Case Number re:6 Notice of Appeal. Case number 17-16190 9th CCA. (Copies sent by Ninth Circuit.) (KAH) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Wed 06/07 1:28 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Arnold Darnell Hornsby. (4 pages) (KAH) |
|
6 | 6
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 06/07 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re:5 Clerks Judgment,4 Order Dismissing Case by Arnold Darnell Hornsby. (2 pages) (KAH) |
|
Att: 1 Motion to proceed IFP | ||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Clerks Judgment
Tue 05/23 10:42 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - It is ordered that pursuant to the Court's Order filed May 23, 2017, judgment of dismissal is entered. Petitioner to take nothing and this action is hereby dismissed. (KAH) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 05/23 10:41 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Petitioner's Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 (Doc. 1) and this case are dismissed. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close this case. In the event Movant files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 5/22/17. (KAH) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Habeas - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Thu 03/30 9:24 AM
Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction in Habeas Case. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DPS) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment
Fri 03/17 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (FKD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241)
Fri 03/17 1:57 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number TUC026168 filed by Arnold Darnell Hornsby. (6 pages)(FKD) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt |