Robert Washington v. Suzanne Peery
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia A Phillips |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02074 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 07/06 10:41 AM
Mail Returned addressed to Robert Washington H-43482, PO Box 2210, Susanville, CA 96127 (Not at CCC). re Order on Petition for Certificate of Appealability13 , Judgment12 , R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations11 (sbou) |
|
Att: 1 Dkt #12, | ||
Att: 2 Dkt #13 | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Certificate of Appealability - Order of USDC
Thu 06/22 1:17 PM
Order by Judge Virginia A. Phillips denying Certificate of Appealability. (mat) |
|
12 | 12
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 06/21 6:13 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Petition is denied and the action is dismissed without prejudice. Related to Order Accepting Report and Recommendations11 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (ib) |
|
11 | 11
order
R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations
Wed 06/21 6:11 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Virginia A. Phillips for Report and Recommendation (Issued)8 (ib) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 06/13 10:54 AM
Mail Returned addressed to Robert Washington H-43482, PO Box 2210, Susanville, CA 96127 . re Notice of Report and Recommendation7 , Report and Recommendation (Issued)8 . (sbou) |
|
Att: 1 Document #8 | ||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 05/31 2:47 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Robert Washington H-43482, PO Box 2210, Susanville, CA 96127 (Not at CCC). re Generic Text Only Entry, 5 . (sbou) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Issued)
Tue 05/23 4:58 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254),1 (ib) |
|
7 | 7
reportrecommend
Notice of Report and Recommendation
Tue 05/23 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Objections to R&R due by 6/12/2017. (ib) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 05/19 4:01 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Robert Washington, petitioner re Order4 . (ib) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 05/17 3:26 PM
Effective May 24, 2017, Judge MacKinnon will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 840 on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 840 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 05/02 1:12 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon, re3 why the Court should not dismiss this action for failure to prosecute, Set deadlines( Show Cause Response due by 5/22/2017.) (sbu) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 03/20 5:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Within 30 days, petitioner is directed to file a statement in regards to his petition as directed by the Court in this minute order.(See document for details). (ib) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 9:31 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (ghap) |
|
Att: 1 CV-111 and CV-60p | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
Fri 03/17 9:30 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE.), filed by petitioner Robert Washington. (ghap) |