Abol G. Helmy v. Aetna Health of California, Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02125 |
Nature of Suit | 151 Contract - Medicare Act |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Aetna Health of California, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Abol G. Helmy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Thu 11/09 10:44 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (jp) |
|
30 | 30
order
Dismiss Case Remand Case to State Court
Thu 11/09 10:42 AM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Re: Pending Motion by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: IT IS ORDERED THAT: (1) Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Document No.21 ) is GRANTED and DENIED in part. The Motion is granted to the extent it seeks remand of the action to state court. The Motion is DENIED to the extent plaintiff seeks fees and costs.(2) The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, 111 North Hill St., Los Angeles, CA 90012, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC section 1447(c). (3) All pending motions are denied without prejudice. (4) The Clerk shall send a certified copy of this Order to the state court. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
textonly
Text Only Notice of Judicial Move to Roybal Federal Building
Tue 06/06 4:50 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES: Effective June 1, 2017, Judge Standish is located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 640 on the 6th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 640 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines
Tue 05/23 11:18 AM
ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Scheduling Conference in this matter is hereby continued from June 8, 2017 to 28 days after the Court rules on the pending Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Remand, with the Joint Rule 26(f) Report being due 14 days before the Scheduling Conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
stip
Continue
Mon 05/22 2:24 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 8, 2017 to 28 days after the Court rules on the pending motions, or a date thereafter convenient for the Court filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc..(Greenfield, Adelle) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Further Continuing Scheduling Conference and 26(f) Report | ||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 05/08 2:04 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss11 and Motion to Remand21 are taken off the 5/11/2017 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 5/11/2017. An order with the court's rulings will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Thu 04/27 1:09 PM
REPLY and Notice of Non-Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 11 filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc.. (Greenfield, Adelle) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/24 4:26 PM
ORDER On Stipulation22 Continuing Scheduling Conference and 26(f) Report Deadline by Judge Fernando M. Olguin that the Scheduling Conference in this matter is hereby continued from 5/11/2017 to 6/8/2017 at 10:00 AM. (jp) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Thu 04/20 11:20 AM
OPPOSITION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court21 filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc..(Greenfield, Adelle) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand | ||
22 | 22
stip
Continue
Thu 04/20 10:12 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Joint 26(f) Report Deadline from May 11, 2017 to June 8, 2017 filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc..(Greenfield, Adelle) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Adelle Greenfield in Support of Joint Stip to Continue Scheduling Conf and 26(f) Report Deadline, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Continuing the Scheduling Conference and Joint 26(f) Report Deadline | ||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Fri 04/07 7:36 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Abol G. Helmy. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Martin, John) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 03/30 2:50 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) |
|
19 | 19
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 03/30 2:49 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All pleadings filed in this matter should contain the case number and the assigned judges' initials to ensure proper routing of documents. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/30 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Standing Order filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc.. (Greenfield, Adelle) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/30 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Confirmation of Notifying State Court of Removal filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc.. (Greenfield, Adelle) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Thu 03/30 11:58 AM
Index filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc. - Index of Exhibits in Support of Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 11 (Greenfield, Adelle) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Related Case(s)
Thu 03/30 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:16-cv-02889-FMO-GJS (Greenfield, Adelle) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Errata
Thu 03/30 9:10 AM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc.. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 11 [#2] Declaration of Adelle Greenfield in Support of Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Greenfield, Adelle) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) - optional html form
Wed 03/29 11:39 AM
ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: Exhibit12 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Title page is missing. (vdr) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Exhibit to Motion
Fri 03/24 10:49 AM
EXHIBIT Exhibit C to Greenfield Declaration In Support of Motion to Dismiss to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 11 filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc.. (Hill, Courtney) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 03/24 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Hill, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Ps and As in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Adelle Greenfield ISO Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Greenfield Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Greenfield Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Adrea Muro ISO Aetna's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order Granting Aetna's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Errata
Thu 03/23 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc.. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 (Greenfield, Adelle) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Number 3 to Sparks Declaration In Support of Removal | ||
9 | 9
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Thu 03/23 8:05 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-02889 FMO(GJSx). Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-02125 FMO(GJSx). Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (rn) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 03/20 5:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 served on 03/17/17.(Greenfield, Adelle) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 03/20 2:09 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 6/12/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dp) |
|
6 | 6
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/20 2:01 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Courts website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judges Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 12:05 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 10:47 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc., a California corporation, identifying Plaintiff - Abol G. Helmy; Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc.; Aetna, Inc. - Parent company of Aetna Health of California, Inc.. (Attorney Adelle Greenfield added to party Aetna Health of California, Inc., a California corporation (pty:dft))(Greenfield, Adelle) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 10:40 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc., a California corporation. (Greenfield, Adelle) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 10:36 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number BC650488 Receipt No: 0973-19531965 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc., a California corporation. (Attorney Courtney C Hill added to party Aetna Health of California, Inc., a California corporation (pty:dft))(Hill, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Gina Sparks in Support of Removal, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 to Sparks Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 to Sparks Declaration | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/20 12:00 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Aetna Health of California, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Abol G. Helmy. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/14/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #1] (et) |