Solid Entertainment, Inc. et al v. Essex Television Group, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02126 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
Essex Television Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Propper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Solid Entertainment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 08/08 4:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In light of the parties recent status report re: settlement, the Court DISMISSES this action without prejudice. On or before September 25, 2017, any settling party may move toenforce the settlement, apply to reopen the action, or stipulate to extend the deadline in which to file such a motion or application.1 If the settling parties do not file any such motion, application, or stipulation on or before that date, the settling parties will be deemed to have stipulated to a dismissal of this action with prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. The Court DENIES AS MOOT the parties stipulation and proposed order extending thetime for Defendant to respond to the complaint16 . The Court VACATES all other dates and deadlines in this action, and the Clerk of the Court shall close the case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Thu 08/03 6:08 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 18, 2017 re Amended Complaint/Petition,10 filed by Defendant Essex Television Group, Inc..(Miller, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Thu 06/29 9:10 AM
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AUGUST 7, 201714 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 06/28 6:20 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 7, 2017 re Amended Complaint/Petition,10 filed by Defendant Essex Television Group, Inc..(Miller, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 06/01 3:37 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Essex Television Group, Inc. answer now due 7/5/2017, re Amended Complaint/Petition,10 filed by Defendant Essex Television Group, Inc..(Attorney Donald A Miller added to party Essex Television Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Miller, Donald) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/10 3:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Solid Entertainment, Inc., Richard Propper. upon Essex Television Group, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/4/2017, answer due 6/5/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Donald A. Miller. (Fischbach, Joseph) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 04/03 11:23 AM
Effective April 10, 2017, Judge McDermott will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 630 on the 6th Floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 630 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mailbox located outside the Clerk's Office on the 1st Floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 03/24 10:11 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiffs Solid Entertainment, Inc., Richard Propper(Fischbach, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 03/21 8:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. See document for requirements. (lom) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 03/20 2:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court therefore DISMISSES Plaintiffs' Complaint with leave to amend. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint within seven days stating an adequate ground for the Court's subject matter jurisdiction. (lom) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 11:45 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Essex Television Group, Inc. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 11:43 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/17 12:50 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Solid Entertainment, Inc. (Fischbach, Joseph) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 12:35 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Richard Propper, Solid Entertainment, Inc.. (Fischbach, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 11:55 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Richard Propper, Solid Entertainment, Inc.. (Fischbach, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 11:54 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19532329 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Solid Entertainment, Inc., Richard Propper. (Attorney Joseph Steven Fischbach added to party Richard Propper(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Steven Fischbach added to party Solid Entertainment, Inc.(pty:pla))(Fischbach, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit |