Gary Kooba v. Selene Finance, LP et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Philip S Gutierrez |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02127 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:37 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janet Kooba
|
|
Defendant
Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ReconTrust Company N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Selene Finance, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Wolf Firm
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Willmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ala T. Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Does 3-10
|
|
Defendant
Ala Talatabai
|
|
Plaintiff
Gary Kooba
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 05/22/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
52 | 52
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 07/07 2:59 PM
ORDER ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL51 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN that pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 41(a), Plaintiff voluntary dismisses the above-captioned action without prejudice, as to all parties. Each party to bear its own costs and fees. It is so Ordered. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
Saturday, July 01, 2017 | ||
51 | 51
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Sat 07/01 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Gary Kooba. Dismissal is without prejudice.(Stilwell, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service |