Bob Greenfield v. Connectto Communications, Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02137 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0227 Violation of Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
Connectto Communications, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Bob Greenfield
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 05/11 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Bob Greenfield. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)
Wed 03/22 8:48 AM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-02137 MWF(SKx). (rn) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 4:40 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Connectto Communications, Inc. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:38 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 2:40 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Bob Greenfield. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bob Greenfield, (Friedman, Todd) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 2:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bob Greenfield. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19534719 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Bob Greenfield. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Bob Greenfield(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd) |