Michael Grecco Productions Inc v. Salem Media Group Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Philip S Gutierrez |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02146 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
Salem Media Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Grecco Productions Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Wed 06/21 8:49 AM
ORDER ON NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE15 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions, Inc., hereby dismisses this action with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. §41(a)(1)(A)(i). (lom) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 06/16 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Thu 05/25 1:09 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (bm) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 05/25 1:04 PM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ACTION; ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Settlement
Mon 05/22 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Settlement of Action filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 04/17 5:02 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Salem Media Group Inc answer now due 5/1/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc.(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/17 5:01 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc, upon Defendant Salem Media Group Inc served on 3/27/2017, answer due 4/17/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kelly Milstead, HR, Auth to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 9:32 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 2:24 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Salem Media Group Inc. (et) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 2:21 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 4:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 4:37 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc, (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Fri 03/17 4:36 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Michael Grecco Productions Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19536447 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michael Grecco Productions Inc. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Michael Grecco Productions Inc(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) |