Chic Luxury Rentals, LLC v. LVH Global Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02147 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:02 AM PDT |
Defendant
Amir Benesh
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LVH Global Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
YHI Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Alan Friedman
|
|
Plaintiff
Chic Luxury Rentals, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago |
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 01/19 12:28 PM
ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder. This matter came on before the Court upon the Stipulation of the parties agreeing to the dismissal of all claims with prejudice34 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims are dismissed with prejudice, and without costs, fees, or disbursements being awarded to any of the parties. (iv) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 01/12 8:09 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by defendants Amir Benesh, LVH Global Inc, YHI Partners, LLC.(McNutt, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Substitution of Attorney -- GRANTED
Fri 12/15 2:44 PM
ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Robert K. Lu for Plaintiff Chic Luxury Rentals, LLC in place of Attorney Joe Utzurrum29 . (gk) |
|
32 | 32
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 12/14 3:05 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT30 , MEDIATION REPORT31 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: THE COURT, having been notified by counsel that the action has been settled on or about 12/12/2017; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is hereby removed from this Court's active caseload until further application by the parties or order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file a proper stipulation for dismissal or a joint report detailing settlement status within 30 days and every quarter thereafter until a stipulation for dismissal is filed. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. All dates in this action are hereby VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk) |
|
31 | 31
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled
Thu 12/14 10:48 AM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Alan Friedman: Mediation held on December 12, 2017 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Friedman, Alan) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 12/14 10:30 AM
NOTICE RE: PARTIES HAVE SETTLED DISPUTE/CASE filed by plaintiff Chic Luxury Rentals, LLC. (Utzurrum, Joe) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Substitute Attorney (G-01)
Wed 12/13 12:15 PM
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Robert K Lu in place of attorney Joe Utzurrum filed by plaintiff Chic Luxury Rentals, LLC. (Utzurrum, Joe) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Tue 09/12 2:01 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Alan Friedman has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 08/03 12:11 PM
Effective August 7, 2017, Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 690 on the 6th Floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 690 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mailbox located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th Floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 07/14 1:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (Amended) filed by Defendant Amir Benesh, LVH Global Inc, YHI Partners, LLC.(Attorney John J McNutt added to party YHI Partners, LLC(pty:dft))(McNutt, John) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 07/10 4:34 PM
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Hearing held and counsel are present. The Court confers with counsel and schedules the following dates: Request for leave to file amended pleadings or to add parties: August 1, 2017; Settlement Completion Cutoff: December 12, 2017; Factual Discovery Cut-off: December 27, 2017; Last Day to File Motions: January 5, 2018; Status Conference re: Settlement (11:00 A.M.): December 18, 2017; Pretrial Conference/Hearing on Motions in Limine (11:00 A.M.): March 19, 2018; and Jury Trial (9:30 A.M.): April 17, 2018. Motions in limine shall be noticed for the same date and time of the Pretrial Conference, and filed 28 days prior thereto. Motions in limine/oppositions shall not exceed five (5) pages in length and no replies will be accepted. Counsel confer with the Court regarding the Courts Order to Show Cause issued June 23, 2017, as stated in Court and on the record. The Court holds the Order to Show Cause in abeyance. Defendant YHI PARTNERS, LLC, shall file its answer on or before July 14, 2017. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (clee) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Mon 07/10 4:13 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than December 12, 2017. The Court further sets a status conference for December 18, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. (iv) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order
Mon 07/03 6:39 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL FOR 7/10/2017, SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The request of John J. McNutt to make a telephonic appearance at the 7/10/2017 at 11:00 AM Scheduling Conference21 is GRANTED. See document for further details. (gk) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 07/03 3:53 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant LVH Global Inc.. (McNutt, John) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Fri 06/30 2:20 PM
Request to Permit Telephonic Appearance by Defendants' Counsel for July 10, 2017, Scheduling Conference filed by Defendants Amir Benesh, LVH Global Inc (McNutt, John) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 06/23 1:18 PM
(IN CHAMBERS)-ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PLAINTIFF show cause in writing not later than July 10, 2017, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendant YHI PARTNERS, LLC, only. In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7.15, oral argument shall not be heard in the above matter unless so ordered by the Court. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of briefs. (iv) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 05/24 10:40 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 05/17 5:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chic Luxury Rentals, LLC, upon Defendant YHI Partners, LLC served on 4/10/2017, answer due 5/1/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hugh Barton as President in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Utzurrum, Joe) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Mon 05/08 10:44 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109)16 Notice of PHV fee due issued incorrectly due to to clerical error. Attorney McNutt re-added to the docket accordingly (yl) |
|
16 | 16
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Mon 05/08 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John J. McNutt. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (yl) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 05/05 12:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PLAINTIFF show cause in writing not later than June 19, 2017, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the following: 1) A proof of service of summons and complaint on defendant YHI PARTNERS, LLC, only on or before the above date, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. (lom) |
|
14 | 14
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 05/04 2:53 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (cj) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 04/27 8:32 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amir Benesh, LVH Global Inc, identifying John J. McNutt; Joe Utzurrum. (McNutt, John) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 04/27 8:26 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Amir Benesh, LVH Global Inc.(Attorney John J McNutt added to party Amir Benesh(pty:dft), Attorney John J McNutt added to party LVH Global Inc(pty:dft))(McNutt, John) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 1:11 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant Amir Benesh. (esa) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 1:05 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant YHI Partners, LLC. (esa) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 1:03 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant LVH Global Inc. (esa) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 12:46 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 12:46 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 5:17 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Chic Luxury Rentals, LLC. (Utzurrum, Joe) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 5:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Chic Luxury Rentals, LLC. (Utzurrum, Joe) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 5:15 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Chic Luxury Rentals, LLC. (Utzurrum, Joe) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 5:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Chic Luxury Rentals, LLC, identifying Chic Luxury Rentals, LLC. (Utzurrum, Joe) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 5:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chic Luxury Rentals, LLC. (Utzurrum, Joe) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 5:07 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19536807 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chic Luxury Rentals, LLC. (Attorney Joe Utzurrum added to party Chic Luxury Rentals, LLC(pty:pla))(Utzurrum, Joe) |