Joel Alcox v. City of Lompoc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00507 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:38 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Harry Heidt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kenneth Ast
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of Lompoc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The County of Santa Barbara
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Alcox
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago |
Friday, May 21, 2021 | ||
150 | 150
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 05/21 12:15 PM
ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF COSTS IN EXCHANGE FOR WAIVER OF RIGHT TO APPEAL149 by Judge James V. Selna. (es) |
|
Thursday, May 20, 2021 | ||
149 | 149
stip
Waive
Thu 05/20 11:32 AM
STIPULATION to Waive Costs in Exchange for Waiver of Right to Appeal filed by Defendants Kenneth Ast, The County of Santa Barbara.(Barry, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |