Sirekan Agekian v. Terrence Wayne Whindbee, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | David T Bristow |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00508 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Tennessee Steel Haulers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Terrence Wayne Whindbee
|
|
Plaintiff
Sirekan Agekian
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Receipt
Mon 05/01 4:47 PM
Receipt of Remand letter from Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino CIVDS 1700508 (twdb) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Thu 04/20 9:58 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. (dro) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Remand Case to State Court
Thu 04/20 9:51 AM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, re Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court14 remanding case to Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case number CIVDS1700508. (see document for details). Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (dro) |
|
14 | 14
stip
Remand Case to State Court
Wed 04/19 11:08 AM
First STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Sirekan Agekian.(Petikyan, Mkrtich) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 04/17 9:31 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: Response12 . Response to Order to Show Cause (Stipulation to Remand) due by 4/21/2017. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Response
Fri 04/14 4:33 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Sirekan Agekian Response to Order to Show Cause(Petikyan, Mkrtich) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Order to Show Cause
Thu 04/13 2:30 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge David O. Carter. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff (s) to show cause in writing no later than April 17, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. (see document for details). (dro) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/23 3:53 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Tennessee Steel Haulers, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only8 served on 3/23/2017. (Hughes, Bradford) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Supplement
Thu 03/23 3:23 PM
SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Tennessee Steel Haulers, Inc.. (Hughes, Bradford) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/22 8:37 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)
Tue 03/21 4:49 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:17-cv-00508 DOC(DTBx). (rn) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 12:47 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 12:46 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:17-cv-0508 CAS (DTBx). (esa) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 03/17 3:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant TENNESSEE STEEL HAULERS, INC., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on 3/17/2017. (Hughes, Bradford) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 3:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant TENNESSEE STEEL HAULERS, INC.. (Hughes, Bradford) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TENNESSEE STEEL HAULERS, INC., (Hughes, Bradford) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1700508 Receipt No: 0973-19535340 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant TENNESSEE STEEL HAULERS, INC.. (Attorney Bradford G Hughes added to party TENNESSEE STEEL HAULERS, INC.(pty:dft))(Hughes, Bradford) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A and B | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/20 11:13 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 to 10, inclusive, Tennessee Steel Haulers, Inc., Terrence Wayne Whindbee, filed by Plaintiff Sirekan Agekian. (esa) |