Chris Lynn Champagne v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John D Early |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00509 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
judgmentCV
Judgment
Thu 05/24 10:15 AM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion and Order filed herewith, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is affirmed and this matter is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lwag) |
|
27 | 27
17
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/24 10:13 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: IT THEREFORE IS ORDERED that judgment be entered affirming the decision of the Commissioner and dismissing this action with prejudice. See document for further information. (lwag) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 05/01 9:22 PM
Cross NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Letellier, Marla) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 04/03 6:05 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Social Security Complaint filed by plaintiff Chris Lynn Champagne. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
7
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/30 3:15 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE; AND (2) AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER.(see document for details) (mba) |
|
23 | 23
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 03/30 10:25 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Parties' Portion of Joint Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Chris Lynn Champagne.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 01/26 1:55 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, Extending Briefing Schedule re Stipulation21 . (mba) |
|
21 | 21
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 01/26 10:26 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Parties' Portion of Joint Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Chris Lynn Champagne.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Extension of Time | ||
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/12 11:25 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: Granting Stipulation Extending Briefing Schedule19 . (mt) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 12/11 2:51 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by plaintiff Chris Lynn Champagne.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/16 12:30 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, Granting Stipulation for Extension of Briefing Schedule17 . The Joint Submission of the parties shall now be filed on or before February 2, 2018. (twdb) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 10/13 10:45 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by plaintiff Chris Lynn Champagne.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Administrative Record
Wed 09/06 9:58 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF CHRIS LYNN CHAMPAGNE (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Letellier, Marla) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 09/06 9:36 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Letellier, Marla) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Thu 08/10 11:09 AM
ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Based upon the stipulation13 of the parties, and for cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including August 9, 2017, in which to provide Defendant with Plaintiff's Settlement Letter Brief; and that Defendant shall have until August 30, 2017, to provide a response, all other dates as set forth in the Case Management Order are adjusted accordingly. IT IS SO ORDERED (dro) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 08/09 1:35 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by plaintiff Chris Lynn Champagne.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/03 10:07 AM
NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF CHRIS LYNN CHAMPAGNE filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (mj) (Letellier, Marla) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/20 11:27 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV-509 JDE on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Wed 04/19 1:08 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Thu 04/06 3:32 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Rosales, Steven) |
|
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120 days)
Thu 04/06 3:32 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Lynn Champagne, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/3/2017, answer due 8/1/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to O. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to A. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Rosales, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held
Mon 03/27 4:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge John D. Early re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal. (ig) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 5:31 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 5:30 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Lynn Champagne, (Rosales, Steven) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 3:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chris Lynn Champagne. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/17 3:44 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Chris Lynn Champagne. (Rosales, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19535684 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Chris Lynn Champagne. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Chris Lynn Champagne (pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven) |